California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB583 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/05/2009

 BILL NUMBER: SB 583AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 5, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 31, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Senator Hollingsworth FEBRUARY 27, 2009 An act to add Section 290.47 to the Penal Code, relating to sex offenders. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 583, as amended, Hollingsworth. Sex offenders. Existing law requires the Department of Justice to make available to the public via an Internet Web site certain information relating to certain registered sex offenders, including the address at which the person resides, as specified. This bill would require the department to  classify   record  each address at which a registered sex offender resides with a unique identifier that shall include the nature of the dwelling, as specified. This bill would also require the department to maintain those classifications within  a private searchable   the  database  maintained for sex offender registrations  and  to  provide that information to other state agencies, including the State Department of Social Services, when those agencies need the information for  law enforcement purposes relating to  investigative responsibilities relative to sex offenders. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 290.47 is added to the Penal Code, to read: 290.47. The Department of Justice shall  classify   record  the address at which a registered sex offender resides with a unique identifier  for address. The identifier shall include a description of the nature of the dwelling, including, but not limited to, a single family residence, an apartment, a motel, or a licensed facility. Each address classified and its association with any specific registered sex offender shall be stored in a private searchable database maintained by the department. The department shall make that   for the address. The information for this identifier shall be captured pursuant to Section 290.015 and the identifier shall consist of a description of the nature of the dwelling, with the choices of a single family residence, an apartment/condominium, a motel/hotel, or a licensed facility. Each address and its association with any specific registered sex offender shall be stored by the department in the same database as the registration data recorded pursuant to Section 290.015. The department shall make that  information available to the State Department of Social Services or any other state agency when the agency needs the information for  law enforcement purposes rela   ting to  investigative responsibilities relative to sex offenders.  This section shall become operative on January 1, 2012.