BILL NUMBER: SB 644ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE MAY 18, 2009 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 27, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 4, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 13, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Senator Denham (Coauthors: Senators Ashburn, Benoit, Correa, and Maldonado) (Coauthor: Assembly Member DeVore) FEBRUARY 27, 2009 An act to amend Section 18978 of the Government Code, relating to civil service examinations. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 644, Denham. Civil service examinations: veterans' preference. Existing civil service law requires that veterans be allowed preference points for civil service employment, as specified. Existing law provides that disabled veterans who become eligible for certification from eligible lists by attaining the passing mark established for an entrance examination held on an open, nonpromotional basis are allowed 10 additional points. Other veterans are allowed 5 additional points. This bill would instead provide that disabled veterans shall be allowed 15 additional points and other veterans shall be allowed 10 additional points. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 18978 of the Government Code is amended to read: 18978. (a) For any entrance examination held on an open, nonpromotional basis pursuant to Section 18950, a veteran who becomes eligible for certification from eligible lists by attaining the passing mark established for the examination, shall be allowed the following additional credits: (1) Disabled veterans, 15 points. (2) Other veterans, 10 points. (b) For purposes of this section, "veteran" and "disabled veteran" have the same meaning as those terms are used in Sections 18973 and 18973.1. (c) Individuals who received veterans points under this section are not eligible for career credits pursuant to Sections 18950.1, 18951, and 18951.5.