California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB677 Amended / Bill

Filed 06/10/2010

 BILL NUMBER: SB 677AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 10, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE DECEMBER 17, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 19, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 14, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Senator Yee  (   Coauthors:   Senators   Alquist,   Cox,   and DeSaulnier  )   (   Coauthors:   Assembly Members   Blumenfield,   DeVore,   Hill,   Lieu,   Miller,   Portantino,   Silva,   Smyth,   Solorio,   Audra Strickland,   and Tran   )  FEBRUARY 27, 2009 An act to add Section 236.3 to the Penal Code, relating to human trafficking. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 677, as amended, Yee. Human trafficking: property: seizure. Existing law defines human trafficking as the deprivation or violation of the personal liberty of another person with the intent to commit certain specified sex offenses with the person or to obtain forced labor or services, as specified. This bill would authorize real property used to facilitate the commission of that offense to be declared and treated as a nuisance, as specified  .  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 236.3 is added to the Penal Code, to read: 236.3. Upon conviction of a violation of Section 236.1,  when   if  real property is used to facilitate the commission of the offense, the procedures for determining whether the property constitutes a nuisance and the remedies imposed therefor as provided in Article 2 (commencing with Section 11225) of Chapter 3 of Title 1 of Part 4 shall apply.