California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB761 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/06/2009

 BILL NUMBER: SB 761AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 6, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 22, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 1, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Senator Aanestad FEBRUARY 27, 2009 An act to add Section 128196 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to health care workforce. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 761, as amended, Aanestad. Health manpower pilot projects. Existing law allows the Office of Statewide Health Planning and Development to approve experimental health workforce pilot projects in specified fields. Under existing law, pilot projects in rural and central city areas are given priority. This bill would require the office, not later than June 30, 2010, and annually thereafter, to submit a report to the Legislature that includes specified information relating to approved or renewed health workforce pilot projects.  The bill would also prohibit the office from granting a continuing approval unless all of the information that the applicant agreed to provide has been reported.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 128196 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read: 128196.  (a)    Not later than June 30, 2010, and annually thereafter, the office shall submit to the Legislature a report relating to all health workforce pilot projects approved or renewed pursuant to this article that includes, but is not limited to, assessment of outcomes  , budget impact, and sources of funding   and the extent to which the project has sufficient funding to perform the activities identified in the agreement  .  (b) The office shall not grant continuing approval to projects unless all of the information that the applicant agreed to provide in the application approved pursuant to Chapter 6 (commencing with Section 920011 of Division 7 of Title 22 of the California Code of Regulations has been reported.