California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB902 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 07/09/2010

 BILL NUMBER: SB 902CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 67 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JULY 9, 2010 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR JULY 9, 2010 PASSED THE SENATE APRIL 22, 2010 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY JUNE 24, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 11, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Senator Ashburn JANUARY 26, 2010 An act to amend Section 14831 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to fire protection. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 902, Ashburn. Fire protection: county regulation. Existing law authorizes the organization of fire companies by filing a certificate with the county Fire and Rescue Operational Area Coordinator, as specified. Existing law authorizes a county which has a population of 1,000,000 or more to regulate the formation, continued existence, and ongoing operations of fire companies, as specified. This bill would reduce the population requirement to 400,000 or more persons in order for a county to regulate the formation, continued existence, and ongoing operations of fire companies. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 14831 of the Health and Safety Code is amended to read: 14831. The board of supervisors of a county that has a population of 400,000 or more on or after January 1, 1985, may, by ordinance, regulate the formation and continued existence of fire companies. The board of supervisors may authorize the formation of any new fire company within the county where it determines that a reasonable level of fire services does not already exist and where the provision of supplemental or competing fire services by any other entity would not result in the mismanagement of emergencies or in confusion to those seeking aid. The board of supervisors may order that any fire companies formed pursuant to this part may continue to exist upon making the determination that the circumstances stated above exist. The board of supervisors may, by ordinance, establish additional regulations and criteria for the establishment and ongoing operation of fire companies organized pursuant to this part.