California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB970 Amended / Bill

Filed 08/20/2010

 BILL NUMBER: SB 970AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 20, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 29, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 14, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 10, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 1, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 18, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 6, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 11, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Senator Corbett (Coauthor: Senator Hancock) (Coauthors: Assembly Members Fong, Mendoza, Saldana, and Swanson) FEBRUARY 5, 2010 An act to add and repeal Article 6 (commencing with Section 12290) to Chapter 3 of Division 12 of the Elections Code, relating to elections. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 970, as amended, Corbett.  Preelection day   Vote by mail  voting. Existing law generally requires voters who wish to vote and who do not cast their ballots by mail to cast their ballot at the precinct polling place on election day. This bill would permit, until December 31, 2016, the Secretary of State, in conjunction with the county elections officials, the University of California, the California State University, and the California Community Colleges, to select 3 college campuses, one each within the University of California, the California State University, and the California Community Colleges, to serve as  preelection day polling places   vote by mail ballot dropoff locations  for any precinct in the county's jurisdiction during at least one general election. The bill would require voluntary consent from the local elections official within whose jurisdiction a  preelection day voting polling place   vote by mail ballot drop   off location  would be located  for preelection day voting to take place in that jurisdiction  . The bill would require that the  preelection day polling places   vote by mail ballot drop   off locations  be  open   available  to receive votes on the 5 business days preceding election day. The bill would require each county elections official who has a  preelection day polling place   vote by mail ballot dropoff location  within his or her jurisdiction during an election to report to the Legislature and the Secretary of State regarding the use of the  preelection day voting polling place   vote by mail ballot drop   off location  within 6 months of the date of the election. The Secretary of State would then be required to report to the Legislature regarding an assessment of  early voting   designated vote by mail ballot dropoff locations  on college campuses by examining the participation in the program and the costs to the state for implementing the program. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. The Legislature finds and declares all of the following: (a)  Preelection day voting on college campuses will allow college students more time   Vote by mail ballot dropoff locations on college campuses will provide college students a more convenient way  to vote and thereby more effectively manage their busy class schedules. (b) Research findings show that the younger a voter becomes engaged in the political process, the more likely he or she will remain an active participant in our democratic system of government. SEC. 2. Article 6 (commencing with Section 12290) is added to Chapter 3 of Division 12 of the Elections Code, to read: Article 6.  Preelection Day Voting Polling Places on College Campuses   Designated Vote by Mail Ballot Dropoff Locations  12290.  (a)    For at least one general election from January 1, 2011, but prior to December 31, 2016, the Secretary of State, in conjunction with the county elections officials, the University of California, the California State University, and the California Community Colleges, may establish  preelection day voting polling places   designated dropoff locations for vote by mail ballots  on three college campuses in the state, subject to the following conditions:  (1)   (a)  One of the college campuses shall be within the University of California. The campus selected must have at least 20,000 registered students at the time of selection.  (2)   (b)  One of the college campuses shall be within the California State University. The campus selected must have at least 13,000 registered students at the time of selection.  (3)   (c)  One of the college campuses shall be within the California Community Colleges. The campus selected must have at least 10,000 registered students at the time of selection.  (4) Preelection day voting shall not take place absent the voluntary consent of the local elections official within whose jurisdiction a preelection day voting polling place would be located.   (b) Each college campus selected to be a preelection day voting polling place shall serve as the polling place for any precinct in the county's jurisdiction.  12291. A  preelection day voting polling place   designated vote by mail ballot dropoff location  established pursuant to Section 12290 shall be open   available  during the five business days prior to the date of the election.  The preelection day voting polling place shall be considered a satellite location of the office of the elections official under subdivision (b) of Section 3018 and shall comply with all the requirements of that section.   12292.     A preelection day voting polling place may not be established for any election other than a general election as it applies to the pilot program in this article.   To maintain the security of the ballots, a designated vote by mail ballot dropoff location shall be placed in a secure location that is centrally located on the campus. The county elections officials shall retrieve any ballots returned to a designated vote by mail ballot dropoff location nightly. The Secretary of State shall provide implementation instructions to participating counties that address ballot security and assurances that the vote by mail ballot dropoff locations shall be utilized solely by eligible voters in the participating county.   12293.  12292.  (a) Each county elections official who has a  preelection day voting polling place   designated vote by mail ballot dropoff location  within his or her jurisdiction during an election shall report to the Legislature and the Secretary of State regarding the election within six months after the date of the election as it applies to  the pilot program in this article   a designated vote by mail ballot dropoff location  . This report shall include, at a minimum, statistics regarding the cost of  a preelection day voting polling place, the turnout of voters at the preelection day voting polling place, and any problems with preelection day voting polling place voting that has   the designated vote by mail ballot dropoff location, the number of ballots returned to a designated vote by mail ballot dropoff location, and any problems with a designated vote by mail ballot dropoff location that have  been made known to the elections official. (b) After receiving the reports from the county elections officials pursuant to subdivision (a) but not later than eight months after the date of the election, the Secretary of State shall report to the Legislature regarding an assessment of  early voting   designated vote by mail ballot dropoff locations  on college campuses by examining the participation in the program as well as the costs to the state for implementing this article on these  two   three  campuses.  12294.   12293.  This article shall remain in effect only until December 31, 2016, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before December 31, 2016, deletes or extends that date.