California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB993 Amended / Bill

Filed 08/20/2010

 BILL NUMBER: SB 993AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 20, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 2, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 28, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Senator Huff FEBRUARY 9, 2010 An act to amend  Section   Sections 319 and  366 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to state highways. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 993, as amended, Huff. State Highway Route 66. Existing law provides that the Department of Transportation has full possession and control of all state highways. Existing law describes the authorized routes in the state highway system and establishes a process for adoption of a highway on an authorized route by the California Transportation Commission. Existing law authorizes the commission to relinquish certain state highway segments to local agencies. Existing law described the authorized route of State Highway Route 66 and authorizes certain portions of the route to be relinquished to the specified cities. This bill  would  revise that description of State Highway Route 66 to indicate portions of the route that have been relinquished or that have been authorized to be relinquished, as specified. The bill would also authorize the commission to relinquish to the City of Claremont that portion of State Highway Route 66 within its city limits under specified conditions. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Section 319 of the   Streets and Highways Code   is amended to read:  319. (a) Route 19 is from Del Amo Boulevard near Long Beach to Gardendale Street/Foster Road in the Cities of Bellflower and Downey, and then, with an interruption of already relinquished route, from Telegraph Road at the Downey City limit to Route 164 (Galatin Road) at the northerly city limit of Pico Rivera. (b) If the commission determines it is in the state's best interests to do so, it may do the following, pursuant to a cooperative agreement between the  respective  city and the department: (1) Relinquish to the City of Bellflower the portion of Route 19 between the city's southerly city limit near Rose Avenue and Gardendale Street/Foster Road. (2) Relinquish to the City of Downey the portion of Route 19 between the city's southerly city limit at Century Boulevard and Gardendale Street. (3) Relinquish to the City of Pico Rivera the portion of Route 19 between Telegraph Road and Gallatin Road.  (4) Relinquish to the City of Lakewood the portion of Route 19 that is within the city limits or the sphere of influence of the city.  (c) A relinquishment under this section shall become effective when the county recorder records the relinquishment resolution containing the commissioner's approval of the relinquishment's terms and conditions. (d)  (1)    Any portion of Route 19 relinquished pursuant to this section shall cease to be a state highway on the effective date of the relinquishment.  (2) The portion of Route 19 relinquished under paragraph (4) of subdivision (b) may not be considered for future adoption under Section 81.   (3) For the portion of Route 19 relinquished under paragraph (4) of subdivision (b), the city shall ensure the continuity of traffic flow, including any traffic signal progression, and shall maintain signs directing motorists to the continuation of Route 19.   SEC. 1.5.   Section 319 of the   Streets and Highways Code   is amended to read:  319. (a) Route 19 is from Del Amo Boulevard near Long Beach to Gardendale Street/Foster Road in the Cities of Bellflower and Downey  , and then, with an interruption of already relinquished route, from Telegraph Road at the Downey City limit to Route 164 (Galatin Road) at the northerly city limit of Pico Rivera  . (b) If the commission determines it is in the state's best interests to do so, it may do the following, pursuant to a cooperative agreement between the  respective  city and the department: (1) Relinquish to the City of Bellflower the portion of Route 19 between the city's southerly city limit near Rose Avenue and Gardendale Street/Foster Road. (2) Relinquish to the City of Downey the portion of Route 19 between the city's southerly city limit at Century Boulevard and Gardendale Street.  (3) Relinquish to the City of Pico Rivera the portion of Route 19 between Telegraph Road and Gallatin Road.   (3) Relinquish to the City of Lakewood the portion of Route 19 that is within the city limits or the sphere of influence of the city.  (c) A relinquishment under this section shall become effective when the county recorder records the relinquishment resolution containing the commissioner's approval of the relinquishment's terms and conditions. (d)  (1)    Any portion of Route 19 relinquished pursuant to this section shall cease to be a state highway on the effective date of the relinquishment.  (2) The portion of Route 19 relinquished under paragraph (3) of subdivision (b) may not be considered for future adoption under Section 81.   (3) For the portion of Route 19 relinquished under paragraph (3) of subdivision (b), the city shall ensure the continuity of traffic flow, including any traffic signal progression, and shall maintain signs directing motorists to the continuation of Route 19.   (e) The relinquished former portions of Route 19 within the Cities of Downey, Long Beach, and Pico Rivera are not state highways and are not eligible for adoption under Section 81. For the relinquished former portions of Route 19, the Cities of Downey, Long Beach, and Pico Rivera shall maintain within their respective jurisdictions signs directing motorists to the continuation of Route 19.   SECTION 1.   SEC. 2.  Section 366 of the Streets and Highways Code is amended to read: 366. (a) Route 66 is from: (1) Route 210 near San Dimas to the Los Angeles-San Bernardino county line at the western city limit of the City of Upland. (2) The eastern city limit of the City of Fontana near Maple Avenue to Route 215 in San Bernardino. (b) The relinquished former portions of Route 66 within the city limits of the Cities of Fontana, Rancho Cucamonga, and Upland are not state highways and are not eligible for adoption under Section 81. For the portions of Route 66 relinquished under this section, the Cities of Fontana, Rancho Cucamonga, and Upland shall maintain within their respective jurisdictions signs directing motorists to the continuation of Route 66 and ensure the continuity of traffic flow on the relinquished portions of Route 66, including any traffic signal progression. (c) (1) Notwithstanding subdivision (a), the commission may relinquish to the City of Claremont and the City of Rialto the respective portion of Route 66 that is located within the city limits or the sphere of influence of each city, upon terms and conditions the commission finds to be in the best interests of the state. (2) A relinquishment under this subdivision shall become effective immediately following the recordation by the county recorder of the relinquishment resolution containing the commission's approval of the terms and conditions of the relinquishment. (3) On and after the effective date of the relinquishment, both of the following shall occur: (A) The portion of Route 66 relinquished under this subdivision shall cease to be a state highway. (B) The portion of Route 66 relinquished under this subdivision may not be considered for future adoption under Section 81. (4) The  city   City of Claremont and the City of Rialto  shall ensure the continuity of traffic flow on the relinquished portion of Route 66, including any traffic signal progression. (5) For the relinquished portions of Route 66, the  city   City of Claremont and the City of Rialto  shall maintain signs directing motorists to the continuation of Route 66.  SEC. 3.   Section 1.5 of this bill incorporates amendments to Section 319 of the Streets and Highways Code proposed by both this bill and SB 1318. It shall only become operative if (1) both bills are enacted and become effective on or before January 1, 2011, (2) each bill amends Section 319 of the Streets and Highways Code, and (3) this bill is enacted after SB 1318, in which case Section 1 of this bill shall not become operative.