California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR45 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 06/17/2009

 BILL NUMBER: SCR 45CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 55 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JUNE 17, 2009 ADOPTED IN SENATE MAY 14, 2009 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 15, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Senator Benoit MAY 7, 2009 Relative to United States Travel Rally Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 45, Benoit. United States Travel Rally Day. This measure would recognize May 12, 2009, as United States Travel Rally Day and call upon Californians to observe this day by rallying to demonstrate the importance of travel and tourism to the economy. WHEREAS, The United States Senate and House of Representatives designated the week beginning on the second Saturday of May of each year, beginning in 1984, as "National Travel and Tourism Week," and elected officials are invited to issue proclamations to raise awareness of the value of travel to the welfare of the nation; and WHEREAS, Travel and tourism play a critical role in the nation's economy as one of the largest industries in the United States; and WHEREAS, Travel is among one of the top 10 industries in 49 of the states in terms of employment, and one of every eight jobs in the United States is created directly or indirectly by travel and tourism; and WHEREAS, Domestic and international visitors spent $97.6 billion in California destinations in 2008; and WHEREAS, The nearly $100 billion in spending supported 924,000 jobs and accounted for combined earnings of $30.6 billion; and WHEREAS, Travel spending also generated $2.2 billion in local taxes and $3.6 billion in state taxes in 2008; and WHEREAS, There were 338 million domestic visitors who traveled to and through California in 2008, of which 86 percent were California residents; and WHEREAS, Approximately 13.4 million international visitors traveled to California in 2008; and WHEREAS, The recession has severely impacted the travel and tourism industry with the recent downturn, beginning in the closing months of 2008, interrupting 74 consecutive months of positive growth; and WHEREAS, Purchases of travel and tourism-related goods and services by international visitors in the United States decreased by more than 13 percent in February 2009 compared to February 2008, representing a $10.1 billion loss; and WHEREAS, Cancellations of business travel, meetings, events, and conventions from just 20 percent of the lodging industry exceeded $220 million nationally during January and February 2009; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes May 12, 2009, as United States Travel Rally Day, and calls upon all Californians to observe this day by participating in appropriate rallies and other activities to raise awareness of the vital role of travel and tourism to Californians and the state's economy; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.