California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR57 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 09/15/2009

 BILL NUMBER: SCR 57ENROLLED BILL TEXT ADOPTED IN SENATE SEPTEMBER 11, 2009 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY SEPTEMBER 12, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Senator Calderon AUGUST 31, 2009 Relative to the CHP Officer David M. Romero Memorial Highway. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 57, Calderon. The CHP Officer David M. Romero Memorial Highway. This measure would designate a specified portion of State Highway Route 60 in Los Angeles County as the CHP Officer David M. Romero Memorial Highway. The measure would request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost for appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs. WHEREAS, California Highway Patrol (CHP) Officer David M. Romero was born on April 2, 1958, in West Covina, California; and WHEREAS, His parents were Gregory and Marina Romero, and his siblings were Greg Romero, Lydia Huard, and Sylvia Romero; and WHEREAS, Officer Romero attended Los Altos High School in Hacienda Heights, California, and graduated in June 1976, after which he attended Rio Hondo College in Whittier, California; and WHEREAS, Prior to working for the CHP, Officer Romero worked in the service department for a Chevrolet dealer in the City of La Puente; and WHEREAS, Officer Romero was selected for the cadet position and entered the CHP Academy on January 11, 1982. Upon graduation from the CHP Academy on May 27, 1982, Officer Romero, badge number 10116, was assigned to the Santa Fe Springs area office as a motorcycle officer; and WHEREAS, Officer Romero also served in the Riverside area office before transferring back to the Santa Fe Springs Area, serving the State of California as a CHP Officer for 23 years and 4 months; and WHEREAS, Officer Romero was married to Sandra Leanos in 1993 and had five wonderful children: Austin, Windsor, Victor, Vanessa, and David Dion; and WHEREAS, Officer Romero was killed in the line of duty on September 23, 2005. While, stopped at a red light on his departmental motorcycle in the City of Industry, he was rear-ended by a vehicle traveling at a high rate of speed, driven by an intoxicated driver; and WHEREAS, Officer Romero was a dedicated officer who loved his job and enjoyed the people he worked with. He was a wonderful father and husband and his greatest joys in life were his wife and children. In his spare time, Officer Romero enjoyed playing elaborate pranks on coworkers and taking his family on annual adventures in Mexico; and WHEREAS, Many admired Officer Romero for the love he showed for his family and the pride he demonstrated in being a CHP Officer; and WHEREAS, In recognition of Officer Romero's ultimate sacrifice for the residents of this state, it is appropriate to dedicate a portion of State Highway Route 60 in Los Angeles County in his memory; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the portion of State Highway Route 60 eastbound from State Highway Route 605 (Mile Post Marker 11.71) to Hacienda Boulevard (Mile Post Marker 15.93) and westbound from Hacienda Boulevard (Mile Post Marker 15.96) to State Highway Route 605 (Mile Post Marker 11.59) in the County of Los Angeles as the CHP Officer David M. Romero Memorial Highway; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the costs of erecting the appropriate signs, consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system, showing these special designations and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering the cost, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the Department of Transportation and the author for appropriate distribution.