California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR83 Amended / Bill

Filed 08/09/2010

 BILL NUMBER: SCR 83AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 9, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Senator Negrete McLeod (Coauthor: Senator Huff) (Coauthor: Assembly Member Torres) MARCH 1, 2010 Relative to  the Officer Russell M. Miller, Sr. Memorial Highway.   memorial highways.  LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 83, as amended, Negrete McLeod.  Officer   Memorial highways: Officer  Russell M. Miller, Sr. Memorial  Highway.   Highway and Correctional Officer Jesus "Jesse" Sanchez Memorial Highway.  This measure would designate a specified section of State Highway Route 60 in Chino as the Officer Russell M. Miller, Sr. Memorial Highway  and a specified section of State Highway Route 83 in Chino as the Correctional Officer Jesus "Jesse" Sanchez Memorial Highway  . The measure would also request that the Department of Transportation determine the cost for appropriate signs showing  this   those  special  designation   designations  and, upon receiving donations from  each  nonstate  sources   source  covering  that cost   those costs, as specified  , erect those signs. Fiscal committee: yes.  WHEREAS, Both Officer Russell M. Miller, Sr. and Correctional Officer Jesus "Jesse" Sanchez proudly served as law enforcement officers in the State of California and it is appropriate to designate state highway routes in the communities in which they served and memorialize the sacrifices made by both officers; and  WHEREAS,  We begin with  Officer Russell M. Miller, Sr., a 12-year veteran of the Chino Police Department,  who  died in the line of duty on February 1, 2000; and WHEREAS, Officer Miller was born on December 27, 1948; and WHEREAS, Upon graduating from Magnolia High School in Anaheim, California, in 1967, Officer Miller joined the United States Navy, where he served six years at the height of the Vietnam War; and WHEREAS, After leaving the Navy, Officer Miller held a series of jobs working as a welder, truck driver, and construction worker, and later applied to become a police officer; and WHEREAS, After completing training, Officer Miller graduated from the San Bernardino County Sheriff's Academy on February 5, 1988, and joined the Chino Police Department, later acting in the capacity as a field training officer and part of the department's mounted enforcement team; and WHEREAS, Officer Miller was known as an officer who was well-liked and respected, and a stabilizing force in his patrol unit; and WHEREAS, In subsequent years, Officer Miller also became involved in family and community activities after his three children were born; and WHEREAS, Officer Miller coached Little League and assisted the United States Naval Sea Cadets Corps that his son, Russell Jr., belonged to; and WHEREAS, Officer Miller and his wife had also recently purchased 20 acres of land in Montana and were looking forward to retirement; and WHEREAS, However, on February 1, 2000, Officer Miller was involved in a routine traffic stop, and, while approaching the stopped vehicle, was struck from behind by a second vehicle, whose driver was under the influence of alcohol; and WHEREAS, Tragically, Officer Miller was critically injured, and was transported to a nearby trauma center where he died while undergoing surgery; and WHEREAS, Officer Miller was laid to rest on February 7, 2000; and WHEREAS, Law enforcement personnel came from throughout California, and as far away as Idaho and Utah, to attend Officer Miller's funeral service at St. Paul the Apostle Catholic Church in Chino Hills, California; and WHEREAS, The ceremony was punctuated by both tears and laughter as Officer Miller's colleagues recalled the man they knew, recounting his immense love for his family  ,  and his skill as a police officer; and WHEREAS, At the end of the funeral service, one of Officer Miller' s daughters, Melissa, released a white dove in a symbolic release of her father; and WHEREAS, Officer Miller is survived by his wife Stephanie, his daughters Melissa and Sarah, his son Russell Jr., and his parents, sisters, and brother; and WHEREAS, Officer Miller's memory lives on through an annual memorial 5K "Run for Russ" race, established in 2001 in Chino, California, an event that brings the community together to celebrate Officer Miller's life and that forges stronger neighborhood bonds; and  WHEREAS, Lastly, in 1972, Correctional Officer Jesus "Jesse" Sanchez, at 24 years of age, became a permanent correctional officer at the California Institution for Men; and   WHEREAS, Officer Sanchez had worked his way through the ranks for such a promotion as part of the federal government's new Work Incentive Program; and   WHEREAS, Previously, Officer Sanchez had graduated from the Correctional Officers School in Soledad with good grades and was an excellent employee; and   WHEREAS, Officer Sanchez was ambitious and always asked what else he could do to be a better officer and colleague; and   WHEREAS, Upon receiving word of his promotion, Officer Sanchez moved his family to Pomona, assured of his future; and   WHEREAS, Tragically and shortly thereafter, Officer Sanchez was gunned down during an ambush while escorting a prisoner to San Bernardino County Court, along with his partner George F. Fitzgerald, about a mile from Euclid Avenue on Edison Street in Chino; and   WHEREAS, Officer Sanchez was killed in the line of duty, and was survived by his wife, Mercedes, a daughter, Beatrice, a son, Danny, and his father, mother, and two sisters; now, therefore, be it   Resolved, That the Legislature further recognizes the contributions made by Correctional Officer Jesus "Jesse" Sanchez to the State of California and hereby designates the northbound and southbound sections of State Highway Route 83 in Chino between State Highway Route 60 and the Kimball Avenue exits as the Correctional Officer Jesus "Jesse" Sanchez Memorial Highway; and be it further  Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature of the State of California hereby recognizes the contributions made by Officer Russell M. Miller, Sr. of the Chino Police Department to the people of the State of California and hereby designates the section of State Highway Route 60 between Mountain Avenue and Ramona Avenue in Chino as the Officer Russell M. Miller, Sr. Memorial Highway; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs  for each memorial highway  , consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system, showing  that special designation   those special designations  and, upon receiving donations from  nonstate sources covering that cost   each nonstate source covering the cost of the respective memorial highway  , to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the Department of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.