California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR99 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 08/27/2010

 BILL NUMBER: SCR 99CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 106 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE AUGUST 27, 2010 ADOPTED IN SENATE AUGUST 19, 2010 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 12, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 2, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Senator Strickland (Coauthors: Senators Cox and Wiggins) (Coauthors: Assembly Members Blumenfield, Davis, Gilmore, Hall, Ma, and Monning) APRIL 12, 2010 Relative to Lupus Awareness Month. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 99, Strickland. Lupus Awareness Month. This measure would proclaim October 2010 as Lupus Awareness Month and would wish Lupus International every success in the future. WHEREAS, Systematic Lupus Erythematosus, commonly known as lupus, is a chronic, complex, and often life-threatening autoimmune disease; and WHEREAS, Researchers estimate that five million people have been diagnosed with lupus or related diseases throughout the world, and approximately 100,000 more are diagnosed every year; and WHEREAS, More people have lupus than AIDS, Cerebral Palsy, Sickle Cell Anemia, and Cystic Fibrosis combined; and WHEREAS, Lupus strikes women in their prime, when they are 15 to 44 years of age, and it affects all aspects of their lives; and WHEREAS, Lupus impacts more than just the life of the patient, it affects their family, friends, coworkers, employers, and the community; and WHEREAS, Lupus International was founded in 1983 as a 501(c)(3) nonprofit organization. The primary purpose of the foundation is to alleviate suffering for lupus patients through patient services, early detection of undiagnosed cases through awareness promotion, and to eradicate lupus by supporting lupus research; and WHEREAS, Lupus International offers the leading pediatric services for children with lupus; and WHEREAS, Early diagnosis and proper treatments are critical to the improvement of the quality of life and survival rate of lupus sufferers; and WHEREAS, Increased public awareness, education, and research are key to winning the battle against lupus; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature proclaims October 2010 to be Lupus Awareness Month and wishes Lupus International every success in the future; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to Lupus International and to the author for appropriate distribution.