California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1056 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 09/12/2011

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1056ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE SEPTEMBER 6, 2011 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY SEPTEMBER 7, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 30, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 6, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 27, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Fong FEBRUARY 18, 2011 An act to add and repeal Section 71091 of the Education Code, relating to community colleges. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1056, Fong. Public postsecondary education: community colleges. Existing law establishes the California Community Colleges, under the administration of the Board of Governors of the California Community Colleges, as one of the segments of public postsecondary education in this state. The board of governors appoints the Chancellor as the chief executive officer of the board. Existing law establishes community college districts throughout the state, and authorizes these districts to provide instruction to students at community college campuses maintained by the districts. This bill would require the Office of the Chancellor, by January 1, 2012, to implement a procedure to facilitate the electronic receipt and transmission of student transcripts by districts. The bill would also require all community college districts, contingent upon the Office of the Chancellor's receipt of new, one-time state, federal, or philanthropic funding sufficient for this purpose and as a condition for receiving funding, to implement a process for the receipt and transmission of electronic student transcripts. The bill would require the Office of the Chancellor to determine the requirements and procedures for dispersing those funds to participating community college districts and to report to appropriate legislative committees, a year after funds are dispersed, the community colleges that have adopted electronic transcripts and the remaining community colleges that have yet to adopt the electronic transcript delivery system. The bill would allow a community college district that has elected to implement a process for the receipt and transmission of electronic student transcripts to later opt out of the program in any subsequent year. This bill would state the intent of the Legislature in enacting this measure, and would repeal its provisions on January 1, 2015. Because this bill would impose new duties on community college districts, it would impose a state-mandated local program. The California Constitution requires the state to reimburse local agencies and school districts for certain costs mandated by the state. Statutory provisions establish procedures for making that reimbursement. This bill would provide that, if the Commission on State Mandates determines that the bill contains costs mandated by the state, reimbursement for those costs shall be made pursuant to these statutory provisions. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 71091 is added to the Education Code, to read: 71091. (a) It is the intent of the Legislature that students enrolling in the California Community Colleges system who desire to apply to and enroll in another segment or in another community college, or have previously enrolled in another segment, have their educational records transferred electronically using transmission systems and protocols that satisfy all of the following criteria: (1) Are secure, are not susceptible to fraud, and protect student privacy in a manner that complies with federal and state privacy laws, including, but not limited to, the Family Educational Rights and Privacy Act of 2001 (20 U.S.C. Sec. 1232g). (2) Permit expeditious review of student transcripts for purposes of admissions, academic assessment, and placement. (3) Reduce operational costs, such as postage, key data entry and manual uploading and downloading of student records, printing, paper, and other materials. (4) Minimize delays in the transmission of student transcripts to accelerate and enhance student transfer. (5) Permit for other technological infrastructure, such as online student planners, student electronic portfolios, and other electronic student services, to be compatible with this system. (6) Conform to national standards and protocols for electronic transcript transmission. (7) Have the capability of receiving and sending student educational records electronically with current and future electronic transcript systems developed and operated by other community college districts, the State Department of Education, the California State University, and the University of California. (b) By January 1, 2012, the Office of the Chancellor of the California Community Colleges shall implement a procedure that complies with subdivision (a) to facilitate the electronic receipt and transmission of student transcripts by community college districts. (c) Contingent upon the Office of the Chancellor's receipt of new, one-time state, federal, or philanthropic funding sufficient for this purpose, and, as a condition for receiving funding under this section, a community college district shall implement a process for the receipt and transmission of electronic student transcripts that complies with subdivisions (a) and (b). (d) (1) The Office of the Chancellor shall determine the requirements and procedures for dispersing funds received pursuant to subdivision (c) to participating community college districts. (2) The Office of the Chancellor shall report to the appropriate policy and fiscal committees of the Legislature, a year after funds are dispersed pursuant to this section, the community colleges that have adopted electronic transcripts and the remaining community colleges that have yet to adopt the electronic transcript delivery system. (e) Any community college district that elects to implement a process for the receipt and transmission of electronic student transcripts pursuant to subdivision (c) may later opt out of the provisions of this section in any subsequent year. (f) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2015, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2015, deletes or extends that date. SEC. 2. If the Commission on State Mandates determines that this act contains costs mandated by the state, reimbursement to local agencies and school districts for those costs shall be made pursuant to Part 7 (commencing with Section 17500) of Division 4 of Title 2 of the Government Code.