California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1122 Amended / Bill

Filed 08/31/2011

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1122AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 31, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 16, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Members John A. Prez and Ammiano (Coauthors: Assembly Members Beall, Bradford, and Ma) FEBRUARY 18, 2011 An act to add  and repeal  Section 1916  to   of  the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1122, as amended, John A. Prez. Juvenile offenders: tattoo removal. Existing law establishes a pilot program requiring the Division of Juvenile Facilities of the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation to purchase 2 medical laser devices for the removal of tattoos, as specified, from eligible participants who are at-risk youth, ex-offenders, and current or former gang members, as specified. This bill would additionally establish the California Voluntary Tattoo Removal Program. The bill would provide that, to the extent funds are  available   appropriated  , the California Emergency Management Agency  may  administer the program. The bill would require that the program be designed to serve individuals between 14 and 24 years of age, who are in the custody of the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation or county probation departments, who are on parole or probation, or who are in a community-based organization serving at-risk youth, through a competitive grant process, as specified. The bill would describe who may apply for grants, and specify the criteria for program participants.  The bill would state findings and declarations of the Legislature in this regard.   The bill would repeal those provisions on January 1, 2017.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 1916 is added to the Welfare and Institutions Code, to read:  1916. (a) The Legislature finds and declares the following: (1) Exoffenders and former gang members seeking to restart their lives and successfully reintegrate into mainstream society or the professional workplace are often precluded from doing so because of their visible tattoos. (2) It is the intent of the Legislature that the establishment of the California Voluntary Tattoo Removal Program aid these individuals in their quest to rehabilitate their lives and get back on the right track. (b) (1) The California Voluntary Tattoo Removal Program is   1916.   (a)     The California Voluntary Tattoo Removal Program is  hereby established.  (2)   (b)  To the extent that funds are  available   appropriated  for this purpose, the California Emergency Management Agency  shall   may  administer the program.  (3)   (c)  The program shall be designed to serve individuals between 14 and 24 years of age, who are in the custody of the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation or county probation departments, who are on parole or probation, or who are in a community-based organization serving at-risk youth.  (c) (1)   (d)  The agency shall award grants in a competitive manner and on a geographically diverse basis, serving both northern and southern California.  (2)   (e)  The Division of Juvenile Facilities of the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, county probation departments, community-based organizations, and relevant service providers may apply for the grants authorized by this section.  (f) Funds appropriated for purposes of this section shall be limited to federal funds.   (d) (1)   (g)  Tattoo removals shall be performed by licensed clinicians who, to the extent feasible, provide their services at a discounted rate, or free of charge.  (2)   (h)  Grantees shall serve individuals who have  gang-related  tattoos that are visible in a professional environment and who are recommended for the program by Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation representatives, parole agents, county probation officers, community-based organizations, or service providers.  (e)   (i)  Individuals who have gang-related  or other  tattoos that may be considered unprofessional and are visible in a professional work environment, who meet the criteria of  paragraph (3) of  subdivision  (b)   (c)  , and who meet any of the following criteria may be eligible for participation in the program: (1) Are actively pursuing secondary or postsecondary education. (2) Are seeking employment or participating in workforce training programs. (3) Are scheduled for an upcoming job interview or job placement. (4) Are participating in a community or public service activity.  (f)   (j)  Use of funding by grantees  may include, but shall not be limited to,   shall be limited to  the following:  (1) The removal of gang-related tattoos.   (1)  (2)  Maintenance or repair of tattoo removal medical devices.  (2)   (3)  Contracting with licensed private providers to offer the tattoo removal service.  (3) Any necessary costs associated with operating a tattoo removal program.   (g)   (k)  Grantees may also seek  state, federal,   additional federal  or private funding to execute the provisions of this section, and use those funds to supplement funding received through the program.  (l) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2017, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2017, deletes or extends that date.