California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1199 Amended / Bill

Filed 01/04/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1199AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JANUARY 4, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Brownley FEBRUARY 18, 2011 An act to  add and repeal Section 8227.1 to   amend Section 15282 of  the Education Code, relating to  child care   school bonds  . LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1199, as amended, Brownley.  Child care: centralized eligibility lists.   School bonds: citizens' oversight committee.   Existing law requires that, if a bond measure that provides financing for certain types of school facilities is approved by voters, then the governing board of a school district or community college shall establish and appoint members to an independent citizens' oversight committee. Existing law also requires members of a citizens' oversight committee to serve for a term of 2 years without compensation and for no more than 2 consecutive terms.   This bill would instead provide that members of a citizens' oversight committee serve for a term of 2 years without compensation and for no more than 3 consecutive terms.   Existing law requires the alternative payment agency in each county, to the extent that funding is made available, to design, maintain, and administer a system to consolidate local child care waiting lists so as to establish a countywide centralized eligibility list. Existing law requires information collected for the centralized eligibility lists to be reported to the Superintendent of Public Instruction on an annual basis on the date and in the manner determined by the State Department of Education.   This bill would require the State Department of Education, to the extent that funding is made available, to, by January 1, 2013, conduct an evaluation for submission to the Legislature of the centralized eligibility lists maintained and administered by the alternative payment agency in each county to determine their success in enabling families with child care needs to obtain information on available child care programs and to obtain care, as specified.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee:  yes   no  . State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Section 15282 of the     Education Code   is amended to read:  15282. (a) The citizens' oversight committee shall consist of at least seven members to serve for a term of two years without compensation and for no more than  two   three  consecutive terms. While consisting of a minimum of at least seven members, the citizens' oversight committee shall be comprised, as follows: (1) One member shall be active in a business organization representing the business community located within the district. (2) One member shall be active in a senior citizens' organization. (3) One member shall be active in a bona fide taxpayers' organization. (4) For a school district, one member shall be the parent or guardian of a child enrolled in the  school  district. For a community college district, one member shall be a student who is both currently enrolled in the  community college  district and active in a community college group, such as student government. The community college student member may, at the discretion of the board, serve up to six months after his or her graduation. (5) For a school district, one member shall be both a parent or guardian of a child enrolled in the  school  district and active in a parent-teacher organization, such as the Parent Teacher Association or schoolsite council. For a community college district, one member shall be active in the support and organization of a community college or the community colleges of the district, such as a member of an advisory council or foundation. (b) No employee or official of the district shall be appointed to the citizens' oversight committee. No vendor, contractor, or consultant of the district shall be appointed to the citizens' oversight committee. Members of the citizens' oversight committee shall, pursuant to Sections 35233 and 72533, abide by the prohibitions contained in Article 4 (commencing with Section 1090) and Article 4.7 (commencing with Section 1125)  of Chapter 1  of Division 4 of Title 1 of the Government Code.  SECTION 1.   Section 8227.1 is added to the Education Code, to read: 8227.1. (a) To the extent that funding is made available for this purpose through the annual Budget Act, the State Department of Education shall, by January 1, 2013, conduct an evaluation of the centralized eligibility lists maintained and administered by the alternative payment agency in each county to determine their success in enabling families with child care needs to obtain information on available child care programs and to obtain care. The department shall submit this evaluation to the relevant policy and fiscal committees of the Legislature. (b) (1) The evaluation described in subdivision (a) shall be submitted in compliance with Section 9795 of the Government Code. (2) Pursuant to Section 10231.5 of the Government Code, this section is repealed on January 1, 2017.