California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1310 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/27/2011

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1310AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 27, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 31, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Furutani FEBRUARY 18, 2011 An act to  add Section 88550.7 to the Education Code, and to  add Section 14013.5 to the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to education. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1310, as amended, Furutani.  Education: career   Career  technical education and workforce development.  Under existing law, the public school system of the state includes, among other schools, secondary and technical schools. Existing law provides for various career technical and workforce preparation programs in the public schools. Existing law also establishes the University of California, the California State University, and the California Community Colleges as the 3 segments of public postsecondary education in this state.  Existing law establishes the California Workforce Investment Board as the body responsible for assisting the Governor in the development, oversight, and continuous improvement of California's workforce investment system. Existing law also establishes the Labor and Workforce Development Agency, which consists of the Office of the Secretary of Labor and Workforce Development, the Agricultural Labor Relations Board, the California Workforce Investment Board, the Department of Industrial Relations, and the Employment Development Department. This bill would require  the Office of the Chancellor and the Board of Governors of the California Community Colleges to work to develop a strategic plan for connecting education and workforce development in the state, in accordance with specified provisions and along with other state entities. In particular, this bill would also require  the Secretary of Labor and Workforce Development,  in conjunction with  the California Workforce Investment Board,  the Office of the Chancellor of the California Community   Colleges,  the State Department of Education, and the California Postsecondary Education Commission  ,  to develop  this   a  strategic plan  , requires to contain specified elements, for connecting the delivery of education and workforce development.   , which would be required to contain specified elements. The bill would require the California Workforce Investment Board and the Office of the Chancellor of the California Community Colleges to report their recommendations for the strategic plan to the Governor and the Legislature on or before July 1, 2012, and would require the Office of the Chancellor of the California Community Colleges to provide the staffing and resources necessary for developing and reporting the strategic plan.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Section 88550.7 is added to the Education Code, to read: 88550.7. The Office of the Chancellor and the Board of Governors of the California Community Colleges shall work to develop a strategic plan for connecting education and workforce development in the state pursuant to Section 14013.5 of the Unemployment Insurance Code.   SEC. 2.   SECTION 1.  Section 14013.5 is added to the Unemployment Insurance Code, to read: 14013.5. (a) The Secretary of Labor and Workforce Development,  in conjunction with  the California Workforce Investment Board, the Office of the Chancellor of the California Community Colleges,  the Board of the Governors of the California Community Colleges,  the State Department of Education, and the California Postsecondary Education Commission  ,  shall develop a strategic plan for connecting the delivery of education and workforce development in the state. In cooperation with representatives from education, business, and labor organizations, the agencies shall make recommendations in the strategic plan that address the contribution of academic and career technical education, at all levels of education and workforce development. (b) The strategic plan shall include, but is not limited to, all of the following provisions: (1) How the state determines appropriate measures for evaluating and collecting data on future workforce needs. (2) The alignment of workforce needs with future postsecondary education programs and capacity at both the state and regional levels. (3) Strategies for fostering long-term improvements in workers' skills and knowledge. (4) Methods for closing the skills gap and strengthening the nexus between education and the workforce. (5) Appropriate measures for improving data collection on future workforce needs. (c) It is the intent of the Legislature that the  board and the Office of the Chancellor of the California Community Colleges solicit   secretary solicit  input from K-12 and postsecondary education institutions, local workforce investment boards, regional occupational centers and programs, adult school programs, and other appropriate governmental entities in developing recommendations for the strategic plan.  (d) (1) The board and the Office of the Chancellor of the California Community Colleges shall report their recommendations for the strategic plan to the Governor and the Legislature on or before July 1, 2012.   (2) (A) The requirement for submitting the report imposed under paragraph (1) is inoperative on July 1, 2016, pursuant to Section 10231.5 of the Government Code.   (B) A report to be submitted pursuant to paragraph (1) shall be submitted in compliance with Section 9795 of the Government Code.   (e) The Office of the Chancellor of the California Community Colleges shall provide the staffing and resources necessary for developing and reporting the strategic plan developed pursuant to this section.   (d) The strategic plan shall be funded from the federal Workforce Investment Act of 1998 (29 U.S.C. Sec. 2801 et seq.), the federal Carl D. Perkins Career and Technical Education Improvement Act of 2006 (20 U.S.C. Sec. 2301 et seq.), the federal Wagner-Peyser Act (29 U.S.C. Sec. 49 et seq.), or other available federal funds for workforce development, or from philanthropic sources.   (f)   (e)  For purposes of this section, "board" means the California Workforce Investment Board.