California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1338 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 08/30/2011

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1338ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE JULY 14, 2011 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 29, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 28, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 16, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 2, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Roger Hernndez FEBRUARY 18, 2011 An act to add Section 33391.1 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to redevelopment. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1338, Roger Hernndez. Redevelopment. The Community Redevelopment Law authorizes the establishment of redevelopment agencies in communities to address the effects of blight, as defined, in blighted areas in those communities known as project areas. Existing law authorizes an agency to, within a survey area or for purposes of development, purchase, lease, obtain, or acquire any real or personal property and to acquire real property by eminent domain. This bill would require, on and after January 1, 2012, an agency to obtain an appraisal by a qualified independent appraiser to determine the fair market value of property before an agency acquires or purchases real property. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 33391.1 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read: 33391.1. On and after January 1, 2012, an agency shall obtain an appraisal from a qualified independent appraiser to determine the fair market value of property before the agency acquires or purchases real property pursuant to Section 33391.