California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1359 Amended / Bill

Filed 08/24/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1359AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 24, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JANUARY 4, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 25, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Skinner FEBRUARY 18, 2011 An act to amend  Sections 14528.1, 14539, 14549.5, 14550, 14551, 14560.5, 14573.51, 14575, 14575.1, 14585.5, 19510, and 19511 of, and to repeal Sections 14523.5 and 19512 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to solid waste   Section 18914 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services  . LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1359, as amended, Skinner.  Solid waste: beverage containers: fiberglass.   Public social services: CalFresh.   Existing law requires a county welfare department, to the extent provided by federal law, to provide CalFresh benefits on an expedited basis to certain households.   This bill would revise these provisions to require that, in accordance with, and to the extent provided by, federal law, the county human services agency provide CalFresh benefits on an expedited basis to certain households.   (1) Existing law, the California Beverage Container Recycling and Litter Reduction Act, requires the Department of Resources Recycling and Recovery to establish reporting periods of 6 months each for redemption rates and recycling rates for specified types of beverage containers. The act also requires the department to determine the redemption rates and recycling rates for those beverage containers for each reporting period and to issue a report on those determinations. The act defines various words for purposes of those provisions, including "redemption rate."   This bill would delete the provisions that require the department to establish reporting periods for redemption rates and that require the department to determine redemption rates for specified types of beverage containers. The bill also would delete the definition of "redemption rate" and make other conforming changes.   (2) Existing law requires the department to calculate a processing fee and a processing payment for each beverage container with a specified scrap value. The processing fees are required to be paid by beverage manufacturers to the department and are deposited in the California Beverage Container Recycling Fund. Existing law requires a beverage manufacturer to pay the department the applicable processing fee for each container sold or transferred to a distributor or dealer within 40 days of the sale, but allows a beverage manufacturer that displays a pattern of operation in compliance with the act, to the satisfaction of the department, to make a single annual payment of processing fees, if the beverage manufacturer meets certain conditions.   This bill would delete the requirement that a beverage manufacturer meet certain of those conditions to be eligible to make a single annual payment of processing fees.   The bill would also correct references and delete obsolete provisions in the act.   (3) Existing law requires a fiberglass manufacturer to ensure that the annual tonnage of fiberglass manufactured or sold in the state by that manufacturer contain at least 30% cullet, unless the department makes a specified determination.   This bill would make technical changes regarding this requirement and would delete obsolete provisions regarding that determination.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee:  yes   no  . State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Section 18914 of the   Welfare and Institutions Code  , as amended by   Section 88 of Chapter 227 of the Statutes of 2011, is amended to read:  18914. (a)  To   In accordance with, and to  the extent provided by  ,  federal law, the county  welfare department   human services agency  shall provide CalFresh benefits on an expedited basis  as provided in subdivision (b)  to households determined to be in immediate need of food assistance. (b)  At the time an applicant initially seeks assistance,   Pursuant to the federal requirements of Section 273.2 (i)(2) of Title 7 of the Code of Federal Regulations,  the county  welfare department   human services agency  shall screen all  expedited service   CalFresh  applications  on a priority basis   for entitlement to expedited service  . Applicants who meet the federal criteria for expedited service as defined in Section 273.2(i)(1) of Title 7 of the Code of Federal Regulations  shall receive either a manual authorization to participate or automated card or the immediate issuance of CalFresh benefits no later than the third day following the date the application was filed. To the maximum extent permitted by federal law, the amount of income to be received from any source shall be deemed to be uncertain and exempt from consideration in the determination of eligibility   entitlement  for expedited service. For purposes of this subdivision, a weekend shall be considered one calendar day. (c) The State Department of Social Services shall develop and implement for expedited issuance a uniform procedure for verifying information required of an applicant. All matter omitted in this version of the bill appears in the bill as amended in the Assembly, January 4, 2012. (JR11)