California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1359 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 09/11/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1359ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 28, 2012 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 29, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 24, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JANUARY 4, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 25, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Skinner FEBRUARY 18, 2011 An act to amend Section 18914 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1359, Skinner. Public social services: CalFresh. Existing law requires a county welfare department, to the extent provided by federal law, to provide CalFresh benefits on an expedited basis to certain households. This bill would revise these provisions to require that, in accordance with, and to the extent provided by, federal law, the county human services agency provide CalFresh benefits on an expedited basis to certain households. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 18914 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, as amended by Section 88 of Chapter 227 of the Statutes of 2011, is amended to read: 18914. (a) In accordance with, and to the extent provided by, federal law, the county human services agency shall provide CalFresh benefits on an expedited basis as provided in subdivision (b) to households determined to be in immediate need of food assistance. (b) Pursuant to the federal requirements of Section 273.2(i)(2) of Title 7 of the Code of Federal Regulations, the county human services agency shall screen all CalFresh applications for entitlement to expedited service. Applicants who meet the federal criteria for expedited service as defined in Section 273.2(i)(1) of Title 7 of the Code of Federal Regulations shall receive either a manual authorization to participate or automated card or the immediate issuance of CalFresh benefits no later than the third day following the date the application was filed. To the maximum extent permitted by federal law, the amount of income to be received from any source shall be deemed to be uncertain and exempt from consideration in the determination of entitlement for expedited service. For purposes of this subdivision, a weekend shall be considered one calendar day. (c) The State Department of Social Services shall develop and implement for expedited issuance a uniform procedure for verifying information required of an applicant.