California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1420 Amended / Bill

Filed 09/01/2011

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1420AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE SEPTEMBER 1, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Committee on Governmental Organization (Assembly Members Hall (Chair), Nestande (Vice Chair), Atkins, Block, Blumenfield, Chesbro, Cook, Galgiani, Garrick, Gatto, Hill, Jeffries, Ma, V. Manuel Prez, Silva, and Torres) MARCH 21, 2011 An act to  repeal   amend  Section 179.9 of the Government Code, relating to the Emergency Management Assistance Compact. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1420, as amended, Committee on Governmental Organization. Emergency Management Assistance Compact. Existing law ratifies, approves, and sets forth the provisions of the Emergency Management Assistance Compact, an interstate agreement that provides for mutual assistance between states responding to emergencies and disasters. The compact becomes inoperative on March 1, 2012, and as of January 1, 2013, is repealed. This bill would  repeal the requirement that the compact becomes inoperative on March 1, 2012, and repealed as of January 1, 2012, thereby making the compact operative indefinitely   extend the inoperative and repeal dates of these provisions until March 1, 2015, and January 1, 2016, respectively  . Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Section 179.9 of the   Government Code   is amended to read:  179.9. This article shall become inoperative on March 1,  2012   2015  , and, as of January 1,  2013   2016  , is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that becomes operative on or before January 1,  2013   2016  , deletes or extends the dates on which it becomes inoperative and is repealed.  SECTION 1.   Section 179.9 of the Government Code is repealed.