California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1420 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 09/20/2011

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1420ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE SEPTEMBER 7, 2011 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY SEPTEMBER 8, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE SEPTEMBER 1, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Committee on Governmental Organization (Assembly Members Hall (Chair), Nestande (Vice Chair), Atkins, Block, Blumenfield, Chesbro, Cook, Galgiani, Garrick, Gatto, Hill, Jeffries, Ma, V. Manuel Prez, Silva, and Torres) MARCH 21, 2011 An act to amend Section 179.9 of the Government Code, relating to the Emergency Management Assistance Compact. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1420, Committee on Governmental Organization. Emergency Management Assistance Compact. Existing law ratifies, approves, and sets forth the provisions of the Emergency Management Assistance Compact, an interstate agreement that provides for mutual assistance between states responding to emergencies and disasters. The compact becomes inoperative on March 1, 2012, and as of January 1, 2013, is repealed. This bill would extend the inoperative and repeal dates of these provisions until March 1, 2015, and January 1, 2016, respectively. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 179.9 of the Government Code is amended to read: 179.9. This article shall become inoperative on March 1, 2015, and, as of January 1, 2016, is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that becomes operative on or before January 1, 2016, deletes or extends the dates on which it becomes inoperative and is repealed.