California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1460 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 07/24/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1460CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 164 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JULY 24, 2012 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR JULY 24, 2012 PASSED THE SENATE JULY 6, 2012 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY MAY 3, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Huber JANUARY 9, 2012 An act to amend Section 13996.55 of, and to repeal Chapter 1.5 (commencing with Section 12095) of Part 2 of Division 3 of Title 2 of, the Government Code, relating to state government. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1460, Huber. California Commission on Industrial Innovation. Existing law establishes the California Commission on Industrial Innovation within the office of the Governor in order to encourage industrial innovation, and to develop policies that maintain California's leadership in the national economy and retain its international competitive position, as specified. The commission is required to, among other things, identify the means of financing innovative industry, including, but not limited to, public and private pension funds and industrial development bonds, hold hearings on its findings, and carry out other specified duties. This bill would repeal those provisions, and make a conforming change. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Chapter 1.5 (commencing with Section 12095) of Part 2 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code is repealed. SEC. 2. Section 13996.55 of the Government Code, as amended by Section 9 of Chapter 31 of the Statutes of 2011, is amended to read: 13996.55. (a) The Secretary of Business, Transportation and Housing shall provide to the Legislature, not later than February 1, 2008, a strategy for international trade and investment that, at a minimum, includes all of the following: (1) Policy goals, objectives, and recommendations necessary to implement a comprehensive international trade and investment program for the State of California. This information shall be provided in a fashion that clearly indicates priority within the overall strategy. (2) Measurable outcomes and timelines for the goals, objectives, and actions for the international trade and investment program. (3) Identification of impediments for achieving goals and objectives. (4) Identification of key stakeholder partnerships that will be used in implementing the strategy. (5) Identification of options for funding recommended actions. (6) Identification of an international trade and investment organizational structure for the state administration of international trade and investment policies, programs, and services. (b) In the course of developing the strategy, the secretary shall also consult with other agencies, boards, and commissions that have statutory responsibilities related to workforce development, infrastructure, business, and international trade and investment including, but not limited to, the Office of the Small Business Advocate, the California Transportation Commission, the California Community Colleges, the University of California, the California State University, the Workforce Investment Board, the Employment Training Panel, and the California Energy Commission. (c) The strategy shall be submitted to the Chief Clerk of the Assembly and the Secretary of the Senate. A copy of the strategy shall be provided to the Speaker of the Assembly, the President pro Tempore of the Senate, and the chairs of the Assembly Committee on Jobs, Economic Development, and the Economy and the Senate Committee on Business, Professions and Economic Development, or the successor committees with jurisdiction over international trade and economic development programs. (d) (1) The strategy shall be reviewed in at least one public hearing by the relevant policy and fiscal committees of each house of the Legislature. The hearings shall be held within 60 days of the strategy being submitted to the Legislature. If the strategy is submitted when the Legislature is in recess, the hearings shall occur within 60 days of the members convening. (2) The legislative committees may make recommendations to the secretary on the strategy, and the secretary may modify the strategy accordingly. (e) The secretary shall report to the fiscal committees of the Legislature on or before February 1, 2009, and by that date each year thereafter, on how the Governor's proposed budget relates to the strategy. (f) The strategy shall be updated pursuant to the procedures of this section at least once every five years.