BILL NUMBER: AB 1503AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 27, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Committee on Budget ( Blumenfield (Chair), Alejo, Bonilla, Brownley, Buchanan, Butler, Cedillo, Chesbro, Dickinson, Feuer, Gordon, Huffman, Mitchell, Monning, and Swanson ) Assembly Member Perea ( Coauthor: Assembly Member Conway ) ( Coauthors: Senators Fuller and Rubio ) JANUARY 10, 2012 An act relating to the Budget Act of 2012 to amend Sections 2 and 3 of Chapter 3 of the Statutes of 2009, Seventh Extraordinary Session, to amend Section 9 of Chapter 126 of the Statutes of 2010, and to amend Section 2 of Chapter 226 of the Statutes of 2010, relating to elections, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget . LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1503, as amended, Committee on Budget Perea . Budget Act of 2012. Safe, Clean, and Reliable Drinking Water Supply Act of 2012: submission to voters. Existing law creates the Safe, Clean, and Reliable Drinking Water Supply Act of 2012, which, if approved by the voters, would authorize the issuance of bonds in the amount of $11,140,000,000 pursuant to the State General Obligation Bond Law to finance a safe drinking water and water supply reliability program. Existing law provides for the submission of the bond act to the voters at the November 6, 2012, statewide general election. This bill would instead provide for the submission of the bond act to the voters at the November 4, 2014, statewide general election. The bill would appropriate $1,000 to the Secretary of State to implement the requirements of the bill. This bill would declare that it is to take immediate effect as an urgency statute and a bill providing for appropriations related to the Budget Bill. This bill would express the intent of the Legislature to enact statutory changes relating to the Budget Act of 2012. Vote: majority 2/3 . Appropriation: no yes . Fiscal committee: no yes . State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 2 of Chapter 3 of the Statutes of 2009, Seventh Extraordinary Session, as amended by Section 7 of Chapter 126 of the Statutes of 2010, is amended to read: Sec. 2. Section 1 of this act shall be submitted to the voters at the November 6, 2012 4, 2014 , statewide general election, instead of the November 2, 2010 6, 2012 , statewide general election, in accordance with provisions of the Government Code and the Elections Code governing the submission of a statewide measure to the voters. SEC. 2. Section 3 of Chapter 3 of the Statutes of 2009, Seventh Extraordinary Session, as amended by Section 8 of Chapter 126 of the Statutes of 2010, is amended to read: Sec. 3. (a) Section 1 of this act shall take effect only upon the approval by the voters of the Safe, Clean, and Reliable Drinking Water Supply Act of 2012, as set forth in that section at the November 6, 2012 4, 2014 , statewide general election. (b) (1) Notwithstanding Section 9051 of the Elections Code or any other provision of law, the Attorney General shall provide and return to the Secretary of State a ballot title and summary in 10-point type for all state ballot pamphlets of the November 6, 2012, statewide general election that contains the following title and summary for Senate Bill 2, adopted by the Legislature at the 2009-10 Seventh Extraordinary Session: "SAFE, CLEAN, AND RELIABLE DRINKING WATER SUPPLY ACT OF 2012" and in the same square under those words: "To protect water quality and ensure safe, clean drinking water; meet the water supply needs of California residents, farms, businesses, expand water conservation and recycling; restore fish and wildlife habitat; reduce polluted runoff that contaminates rivers, streams, beaches, and bays; and protect the safety of water supplies threatened by earthquakes and other natural disasters; the State of California shall issue bonds totaling eleven billion one hundred forty million dollars ($11,140,000,000) paid from existing state funds subject to independent, annual audits, and citizen oversight." (2) The language in paragraph (1) shall be the only language included in the title and summary for Senate Bill 2, adopted by the Legislature at the 2009-10 Seventh Extraordinary Session, and the Attorney General shall not supplement, subtract from, or revise that language. (3) Notwithstanding any other provision of law, including Sections 9050, 9051, 13247, and 13262 of the Elections Code, the language in paragraph (1) for the title and summary shall also be the language included in the ballot label for the condensed statement of the ballot title, and the Attorney General shall not supplement, subtract from, or revise that language, except that the Attorney General may include the fiscal impact summary prepared pursuant to Section 9087 of the Elections Code and Section 88003 of the Government Code. The ballot label is the condensed statement of the ballot title and the financial impact summary. (c) Opposite the square, there shall be left spaces in which the voters may place a cross in the manner required by law to indicate whether they vote for or against the act. (d) Where the voting in the election is done by means of voting machines used pursuant to law in the manner that carries out the intent of this section, the use of the voting machines and the expression of the voters' choices by means thereof are in compliance with this section. SEC. 3. Section 9 of Chapter 126 of the Statutes of 2010 is amended to read: Sec. 9. The Secretary of State shall submit the heading of Division 26.7 (commencing with Section 79700) of, and Sections 79700, 79702, 79716, 79749, and 79749.5 of, the Water Code, as amended by Sections 1 to 6, inclusive, of this act, in place of the heading of Division 26.7 (commencing with Section 79700) of, and Sections 79700, 79702, 79716, 79749, and 79749.5 of, the Water Code, as added by Section 1 of Chapter 3 of the Seventh Extraordinary Session of the Statutes of 2009, in order that they are voted upon as part of the Safe, Clean, and Reliable Drinking Water Supply Act of 2012, at the November 6, 2012 4, 2014 , statewide general election. SEC. 4. Section 2 of Chapter 226 of the Statutes of 2010 is amended to read: Sec. 2. The Secretary of State shall submit Section 79770 of the Water Code, as amended by Section 1 of this act, in place of Section 79770 of the Water Code, as added by Section 1 of Chapter 3 of the Seventh Extraordinary Session of the Statutes of 2009, in order that it is voted upon as part of the Safe, Clean, and Reliable Drinking Water Supply Act of 2012 at the November 6, 2012 4, 2014 , statewide general election. SEC. 5. The sum of one thousand dollars ($1,000) is hereby appropriated from the General Fund to the Secretary of State to implement the requirements of this act. SEC. 6. This act is a bill providing for appropriations related to the Budget Bill within the meaning of subdivision (e) of Section 12 of Article IV of the California Constitution, has been identified as related to the budget in the Budget Bill, and shall take effect immediately. SEC. 7. This act is an urgency statute necessary for the immediate preservation of the public peace, health, or safety within the meaning of Article IV of the Constitution and shall go into immediate effect. The facts constituting the necessity are: In order to ensure that the Safe, Clean, and Reliable Drinking Water Supply Act of 2012 is submitted to the voters at the November 4, 2014, statewide general election, it is necessary that this act take effect immediately. SECTION 1. It is the intent of the Legislature to enact statutory changes relating to the Budget Act of 2012.