California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1550 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 09/20/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1550CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 398 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 20, 2012 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 20, 2012 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 13, 2012 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 21, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 6, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 28, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 14, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 21, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 12, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Bonilla (Coauthors: Assembly Members Allen, Huffman, Jeffries, Williams, and Yamada) (Coauthors: Senators Alquist and Strickland) JANUARY 25, 2012 An act to amend Section 5068 of, and to add Section 5068.1 to, the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1550, Bonilla. Vehicles: veterans' organizations license plates: fees. Under existing law, the Department of Motor Vehicles (DMV) issues environmental and other specialized license plates, including veterans' organizations license plates. Veterans' organizations license plates are required to have a distinctive design or decal. The Department of Veterans Affairs may modify the plate design or decals, but is prohibited from issuing those plates or decals, as modified, until all existing plates or decals have been issued. This bill would authorize prescribed persons to apply for a special interest license plate that honors all veterans or veterans who served in a particular war or armed conflict. This bill would require the department to issue by July 1, 2013, decals for plates issued under this program that honor all veterans or veterans who served in a particular war or armed conflict to an applicant, to make available to an applicant, upon request, in lieu of this decal, a "yellow ribbons/support our troops" decal, and to eliminate from inventory any decals for which the department determines that demand is insufficient to maintain that inventory in a cost-effective manner. These special interest license plates are subject to fees for issuance, renewal, or personalization that are additional to those required for nonspecialized license plates. Existing law requires that the revenue from those additional fees, less the DMV's costs, be deposited in the Veterans Service Office Fund. Existing law requires money in the Veterans Service Office Fund to be available, upon appropriation by the Legislature, to the Department of Veterans Affairs for allocation and disbursement to counties for the operation of county veterans service offices. This bill would increase the amount of those additional fees. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 5068 of the Vehicle Code is amended to read: 5068. (a) (1) (A) A veterans' organization may apply either individually or with other veterans' organizations to meet the application threshold set forth in Section 5060 for special interest plates. An organization that meets the minimum application requirement by applying with other organizations under this subdivision shall be issued a regular license plate bearing a distinctive design or decal approved under subdivision (a) of Section 5060. (B) The Department of Veterans Affairs may modify the distinctive design or decal described in subparagraph (A), consistent with the design criteria imposed by Section 5060, to honor all veterans, or veterans who served in a particular war or armed conflict as described in subdivision (a) of Section 5068.1. Special interest plates issued under this section and bearing the modified design or decal shall be issued only after all existing plates have been issued. (2) Any person who is the registered owner or lessee of a passenger vehicle, commercial motor vehicle, motorcycle, trailer, or semitrailer registered or certificated with the department, or any person who applies for an original registration or renewal of registration of that vehicle may apply under this section for a special interest license plate with a decal that honors all veterans or veterans who served in a particular war or armed conflict. (3) Special interest license plates issued under this section may be issued in a combination of numbers or letters, or both, requested by the owner or lessee of the vehicle, to be displayed in addition to the design or decal authorized under paragraph (1), subject to Section 5105. (b) In addition to the regular fees for an original registration, a renewal of registration, or a transfer of registration, the following fees shall be paid by individuals applying for a special interest license plate or a decal issued under this section: (1) Fifty dollars ($50) for the initial issuance of the plates and decals. The plates shall be permanent and shall not be required to be replaced. (2) Forty dollars ($40) for each renewal of registration that includes the continued display of the plates or decals. (3) Fifteen dollars ($15) for transfer of the plates to another vehicle. (4) Thirty-five dollars ($35) for replacement plates, if they become damaged or unserviceable. (5) Ten dollars ($10) for replacement decals, if they become damaged or unserviceable. (6) Seventy-eight dollars ($78) for the personalization of the plates, as authorized under paragraph (3) of subdivision (a). (c) The department shall maintain on its Internet Web site, a link to order online the special interest license plates issued pursuant to this section. SEC. 2. Section 5068.1 is added to the Vehicle Code, to read: 5068.1. By July 1, 2013, the department shall do all of the following: (a) Issue a distinctive decal pursuant to subparagraph (B) of paragraph (1) of subdivision (a) of Section 5068 to an applicant for an original or renewal of vehicle registration for veteran plates or plates honoring veterans to allow that applicant the option of recognizing his or her veteran status in, or honoring veterans of, a particular war or armed conflict, including, but not limited to, those who served in the active military, naval, or air service and performed any portion of their service during any of the periods described in Section 980 of the Military and Veterans Code, including active duty in a campaign or expedition for service in which a medal was authorized by the government of the United States. (b) Make available to an applicant, upon request, a "yellow ribbon/support our troops" decal in lieu of the distinctive decal described in subdivision (a). (c) Eliminate from inventory any decals for which the department determines that demand is insufficient to maintain that inventory in a cost-effective manner.