California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1620 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 08/27/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1620CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 190 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE AUGUST 27, 2012 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR AUGUST 27, 2012 PASSED THE SENATE JULY 6, 2012 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 9, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 27, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Wieckowski FEBRUARY 8, 2012 An act to amend Section 25110.11 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to hazardous waste. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1620, Wieckowski. Hazardous waste: contained gaseous material. Under existing law, "contained gaseous material" is regulated by the Department of Toxic Substances Control as a hazardous waste. Existing law defines contained gaseous material as any gas that is contained in an enclosed cylinder or other enclosed container. Existing law exempts from the definition of contained gaseous material any exhaust gas, flue gas, or other vapor stream, regardless of the source, that is controlled by a permitted or exempted air pollution control device. This bill would instead exempt from the definition of "contained gaseous material" any exhaust or flue gas, or other vapor stream, or any air or exhaust gas stream that is filtered or otherwise processed to remove particulates, dusts, or other air pollutants, regardless of the source. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 25110.11 of the Health and Safety Code is amended to read: 25110.11. (a) "Contained gaseous material," for purposes of subdivision (a) of Section 25124 or any other provision of this chapter, means any gas that is contained in an enclosed cylinder or other enclosed container. (b) Notwithstanding subdivision (a) of this section, "contained gaseous material" does not include any exhaust or flue gas, or other vapor stream, or any air or exhaust gas stream that is filtered or otherwise processed to remove particulates, dusts, or other air pollutants, regardless of the source.