California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1662 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 09/24/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1662CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 499 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 24, 2012 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 24, 2012 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 21, 2012 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY MAY 3, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 26, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Fong FEBRUARY 14, 2012 An act to amend Section 1006 of the Education Code, relating to county educational agencies. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1662, Fong. County boards of education: members. Under existing law, any registered voter is eligible to be a member of the county board of education except the county superintendent of schools, any member of his or her staff, or any employee of a school district. This bill would provide that any employee of a school district that is within the jurisdiction of the county board of education is ineligible to be a member of the county board of education. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 1006 of the Education Code is amended to read: 1006. (a) Any registered voter is eligible to be a member of the county board of education except the county superintendent of schools or any member of his or her staff, or any employee of a school district that is within the jurisdiction of the county board of education. (b) Notwithstanding any other law, the county board of education may adopt or the residents of the county may propose, by initiative, a proposal to limit or repeal a limit on the number of terms a member of the county board of education may serve on the county board of education. Any proposal to limit the number of terms a member of the county board of education may serve on the county board of education shall apply prospectively only and shall not become operative unless it is submitted to the electors of the county at a regularly scheduled election and a majority of the votes cast on the question favor the adoption of the proposal. (c) An initiative measure proposed pursuant to subdivision (b) shall be subject to the procedures set forth in Chapter 2 (commencing with Section 9100) of Division 9 of the Elections Code.