California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1705 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 08/27/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1705CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 192 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE AUGUST 27, 2012 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR AUGUST 27, 2012 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 9, 2012 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY MAY 21, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 26, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Silva FEBRUARY 15, 2012 An act to amend Sections 60852.1 and 60852.2 of the Education Code, relating to pupil assessment. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1705, Silva. Pupil assessment: high school exit examination: eligible pupils with disabilities. Existing law requires each pupil completing grade 12 to successfully pass the high school exit examination as a condition of receiving a diploma of graduation or a condition of graduation from high school. Existing law requires by October 1, 2010, that the State Board of Education, taking into consideration specified findings and recommendations, adopt regulations for alternative means by which eligible pupils with disabilities, as defined, may demonstrate that they have achieved the same level of academic achievement in the content standards required for passage of the high school exit examination. Existing law defines an eligible pupil with a disability as a pupil who has, among other things, an anticipated graduation date and is scheduled to receive a high school diploma on or after January 1, 2011, and the school district or state special school certifies that the pupil has satisfied or will satisfy all other state and local requirements for the receipt of a high school diploma on or after January 1, 2011. Existing law (1) authorizes an eligible pupil with a disability, commencing January 1, 2011, to participate in the alternative means of demonstrating the level of academic achievement in the content standards required for passage of the high school exit examination in the manner prescribed by the regulations adopted by the state board, and (2) authorizes the state board, by regulation, to extend the January 1, 2011, date by up to 2 years, as specified. This bill would instead define an eligible pupil with a disability as a pupil who has, among other things, an anticipated graduation date and is scheduled to receive a high school diploma on or after July 1, 2015, and the school district or state special school certifies that the pupil has satisfied or will satisfy all other state and local requirements for the receipt of a high school diploma on or after July 1, 2015. The bill would instead (1) authorize an eligible pupil with a disability, commencing July 1, 2015, to participate in the alternative means of demonstrating the level of academic achievement in the content standards required for passage of the high school exit examination in the manner prescribed by the regulations adopted by the state board, and (2) authorize the state board, by regulation, to extend the July 1, 2015, date by up to one year, as specified. The bill would also make conforming and nonsubstantive changes. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 60852.1 of the Education Code is amended to read: 60852.1. (a) The Superintendent shall recommend, and the state board shall select, members of a panel that will convene to make recommendations regarding alternative means for eligible pupils with disabilities to demonstrate that they have achieved the same level of academic achievement in the content standards in English language arts or mathematics, or both, required for passage of the high school exit examination. (1) The panel shall be composed of educators and other individuals who have experience with the population of pupils with disabilities eligible for alternative means of demonstrating academic achievement, as defined in Section 60852.2, and educators and other individuals who have expertise with multiple forms of assessment. The panel shall consult with experts in other states that offer alternative means for pupils with disabilities to demonstrate academic achievement. A majority of the panel shall be classroom teachers. (2) The panel shall make findings and recommendations regarding all of the following: (A) Specific options for alternative assessments, submission of evidence, or other alternative means by which eligible pupils with disabilities may demonstrate that they have achieved the same level of academic achievement in the content standards in English language arts or mathematics, or both, required for passage of the high school exit examination. (B) Scoring or other evaluation systems designed to ensure that the eligible pupil with a disability has achieved the same competence in the content standards required for passage of the high school exit examination. (C) Processes to ensure that the form, content, and scoring of assessments, evidence, or other means of demonstrating academic achievement are applied uniformly across the state. (D) Estimates of one-time or ongoing costs, and whether each option should be implemented on a statewide or regional basis, or both. (3) The panel shall present its options and make its findings and recommendations to the Superintendent and to the state board by October 1, 2009. (b) For those portions of, or those academic content standards assessed by, the high school exit examination for which the state board determines it is feasible to create alternative means by which eligible pupils with disabilities may demonstrate the same level of academic achievement required for passage of the high school exit examination, the state board, taking into consideration the findings and recommendations of the panel, shall adopt regulations for alternative means by which eligible pupils with disabilities, as defined in Section 60852.2, may demonstrate that they have achieved the same level of academic achievement in the content standards required for passage of the high school exit examination. The regulations shall include appropriate timelines and the manner in which eligible pupils with disabilities and school districts shall be timely notified of the results. SEC. 2. Section 60852.2 of the Education Code is amended to read: 60852.2. (a) For purposes of this chapter, "eligible pupil with a disability" means a pupil who meets all of the following criteria: (1) The pupil has an operative individualized education program adopted pursuant to the federal Individuals with Disabilities Education Act (20 U.S.C. Sec. 1400 et seq.) or a plan adopted pursuant to Section 504 of the federal Rehabilitation Act of 1973 (29 U.S.C. Sec. 794(a)) that indicates that the pupil has an anticipated graduation date and is scheduled to receive a high school diploma on or after July 1, 2015. (2) The pupil has not passed the high school exit examination. (3) The school district or state special school certifies that the pupil has satisfied or will satisfy all other state and local requirements for the receipt of a high school diploma on or after July 1, 2015. (4) The pupil has attempted to pass those sections not yet passed of the high school exit examination at least twice after grade 10, including at least once during the current enrollment of the pupil in grade 12, with the accommodations or modifications, if any, specified in the individualized education program adopted pursuant to the federal Individuals with Disabilities Education Act (20 U.S.C. Sec. 1400 et seq.) or the plan adopted pursuant to Section 504 of the federal Rehabilitation Act of 1973 (29 U.S.C. Sec. 794(a)) of the pupil. (b) Commencing July 1, 2015, an eligible pupil with a disability may participate in the alternative means of demonstrating the level of academic achievement in the content standards required for passage of the high school exit examination in the manner prescribed by the regulations adopted pursuant to Section 60852.1. The state board may, by regulation, extend this date by up to one year if it determines that an extension is necessary for the appropriate implementation of the regulations adopted pursuant to Section 60852.1. (c) An eligible pupil with a disability shall be deemed to have satisfied the requirements of Section 60851 for those parts of the high school exit examination that the eligible pupil with a disability has not passed if the school district in which the eligible pupil with a disability is enrolled is notified that the eligible pupil with a disability has successfully demonstrated the same level of academic achievement in the statewide content standards as the level of academic achievement that is necessary to pass the high school exit examination through one or more of the alternative means prescribed in the regulations adopted pursuant to Section 60852.1.