California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1765 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 08/13/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1765ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 6, 2012 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 9, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 5, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 25, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Brownley (Coauthors: Assembly Members Ammiano, Silva, and Solorio) FEBRUARY 17, 2012 An act to add Section 44259.4 to the Education Code, relating to teachers. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1765, Brownley. Teacher leaders: advisory panel. Existing law establishes the Commission on Teacher Credentialing to, among other things, establish professional standards, assessments, and examinations for entry and advancement in the education profession. This bill would require the commission to convene an advisory panel to explore the recognition of leadership roles within the teaching career pathway, as specified. The commission would be required to consider the findings of the advisory panel and report to the Governor and the Legislature on recommendations for the recognition of teacher leaders within one year of the advisory panel being convened. The bill would require the commission to use private funds to support the advisory panel, and would prohibit the use of General Fund moneys for this purpose. The bill would require the advisory panel to be convened only after the Department of Finance determines that private funds, in an amount sufficient to fully support the activities of the advisory panel, have been deposited with the state. The bill would require the department to file a written statement with specified persons that the determination has been made. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. (a) The Legislature finds and declares all of the following: (1) Given the profound educational changes that have taken place over the past decade, there has been a statewide increase in the use of experienced teachers as mentors, support providers, master teachers, teacher leaders, and providers of professional development services. (2) The increased use of the knowledge, skills, and abilities of experienced teachers as peer developers and supporters is largely the result of programs such as teacher induction and internship programs, as well as local efforts to improve teacher quality in order to improve pupil achievement. (3) Questions have been raised as to whether teachers are appropriately prepared and recognized for these types of roles within the existing teaching certification and professional development mechanisms. (4) Teachers continue to develop in their professions throughout their careers. However, the current structure provides limited choices for veteran teachers looking for new opportunities to apply their experience and expertise without leaving the classroom. (5) Highly qualified teachers are seeking increased opportunities for career advancement that keep them involved in pupil instruction, and not necessarily on the administrator ladder. (b) It is the intent of the Legislature to examine differentiated career opportunities for teachers to promote teacher quality and increase pupil achievement and school improvement. SEC. 2. Section 44259.4 is added to the Education Code, to read: 44259.4. (a) The commission shall convene an advisory panel of stakeholders with expertise in the field of teacher leadership to explore the recognition of leadership roles within the teaching career pathway. The advisory panel shall consider issues related to teacher leadership, including, but not limited to, the following: (1) The various roles of teacher leaders in today's public schools such as master teachers, mentors, induction support providers and fieldwork supervisors, instructional leaders, department chairs, curriculum coordinators, peer coaches, literacy or mathematics coordinators, assessment coordinators, and accreditation coordinators. (2) The use of teachers as instructional leaders and peer role models to foster innovation needed to effect change in turnaround schools. (3) How recognition of teacher leaders may promote teacher retention. (4) Formal preparation and recognition of the leadership roles that teachers assume. (5) Application of adult learning theories to improve the instruction of teacher peers. (6) Processes and procedures in other states for recognition of teacher leaders. (7) The nexus of recognition of teacher leaders with the national board certification process. (8) How recognition, including, but not limited to, an authorization, credential, recognition of study, special recognition, emphasis or specialization, could be developed and realized while maintaining local flexibility in hiring and staffing needs. (9) The feasibility of teacher leader career ladders that could be used by school districts to align salary schedules or alternative salary structures. (10) Current research and practices in teacher leader and mentor programs, including, but not limited to, the Beginning Teacher Support and Assessment System standards for support provider and assessor training, statewide subject matter projects, and the Certificated Staff Mentoring Program. (b) The advisory panel shall include, but is not limited to, representatives of the following: (1) Teachers who are performing school leadership duties. (2) Teacher and administrator organizations. (3) The Superintendent. (4) Commission-approved teacher preparation programs. (5) School boards and school districts. (6) Other organizations deemed appropriate by the commission. (c) The commission shall consider the findings of the advisory panel and report to the Governor and Legislature on recommendations for the recognition of teacher leaders within one year of the advisory panel being convened pursuant to this section. (d) The commission shall use private funds to support the advisory panel described in this section. General Fund moneys shall not be used for this purpose. (e) (1) The requirement for submitting a report imposed under subdivision (c) is inoperative on January 1, 2017, pursuant to Section 10231.5 of the Government Code. (2) A report submitted pursuant to subdivision (c) shall be submitted in compliance with Section 9795 of the Government Code. (f) The advisory panel shall be convened pursuant to this section only after the Department of Finance determines that private funds, in an amount sufficient to fully support the activities of the advisory panel, have been deposited with the state. If the Department of Finance determines that sufficient funding has been secured to establish and support the activities of the advisory panel, the Department of Finance shall file a written statement with the Secretary of the Senate, the Chief Clerk of the Assembly, and the Legislative Counsel memorializing that this determination has been made.