California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1778 Amended / Bill

Filed 03/28/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1778AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 28, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Williams FEBRUARY 21, 2012 An act to amend Section 99232.3 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to transportation. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1778, as amended, Williams. Local transportation funds. Existing law requires that revenues from 1/4% of the local sales and use tax rate be transferred to the local transportation fund of each county for allocation, as directed by the transportation planning agency, to various transportation purposes, under what is commonly known as the Transportation Development Act. Existing law specifies the allowable uses for local transportation funds, and generally requires, after certain deductions, that the funds attributed to the area of apportionment of each transit operator be used solely for transit purposes in counties with a population of 500,000 or more as of the 1970 census. However, in counties with a population under 500,000 as of the 1970 census and in certain other counties, these funds may also be used for local streets and roads, if the transportation planning agency finds that there are no unmet transit needs or no unmet transit needs that are reasonable to meet, and for other specified purposes. Existing law, effective July 1, 2014, generally requires a county with a population under 500,000 as of the 1970 census that has a population of 500,000 or more as of the 2000 census or a future census to use funds attributable to the urbanized area of the county solely for transit purposes, except that a city with a population of 100,000 or fewer in an urbanized area in that county would not be so restricted. Existing law provides that the July 1, 2014, requirements and exemptions do not apply to Ventura County, and instead generally requires all local transportation funds in that county to be used for transit purposes as of that date unless a specified report is submitted by the Ventura County Transportation Commission to the transportation committees of the Legislature by December 31, 2011, and a recommended legislative proposal in that report relative to reorganization of transit services and expenditure of these funds is enacted by the end of the 2011-12 legislative session. This bill  , with respect to Ventura County, would instead require the Ventura County Transportation Commission to submit the above-referenced report by January 31, 2013, thereby imposing a state-mandated local program. The bill  would provide that local transportation funds in Ventura County would be available solely for transit purposes beginning July 1, 2013, rather than July 1, 2014, unless  a legislative proposal in the report is enacted and implemented by June 30, 2013, with respect to a different allocation of revenues   the legislative proposal described above is enacted by the   specified date  .  The California Constitution requires the state to reimburse local agencies and school districts for certain costs mandated by the state. Statutory provisions establish procedures for making that reimbursement.   This bill would provide that, if the Commission on State Mandates determines that the bill contains costs mandated by the state, reimbursement for those costs shall be made pursuant to these statutory provisions.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program:  yes   no  . THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 99232.3 of the Public Utilities Code is amended to read: 99232.3. Sections 99232.1 and 99232.2 shall not apply to Ventura County. The Ventura County Transportation Commission  shall   may  submit to the Senate Committee on Transportation and Housing and the Assembly Committee on Transportation a report analyzing options for organizing public mass transportation services in the county, for the expenditure of revenues deposited in the local transportation fund, and a recommended legislative proposal for implementing the plan by  January 31, 2013   December 31, 2011  . If the legislative proposal is not enacted  and implemented by June 30, 2013   by the end of the 2011-   12 Regular Session of the Legislature  , revenues deposited in the local transportation fund in that county shall be available for the fiscal year beginning on July 1, 2013, and each fiscal year thereafter, solely for claims for Article 4 (commencing with Section 99260) and Article 4.5 (commencing with Section 99275) purposes.  SEC. 2.   If the Commission on State Mandates determines that this act contains costs mandated by the state, reimbursement to local agencies and school districts for those costs shall be made pursuant to Part 7 (commencing with Section 17500) of Division 4 of Title 2 of the Government Code.