California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1786 Amended / Bill

Filed 06/18/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1786AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 18, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 26, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 16, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Members Mansoor and Hagman (Coauthors: Assembly Members Bill Berryhill, Donnelly, Harkey, Jeffries, Ma, Miller, Silva, and Valadao) (Coauthors: Senators Cannella, Dutton, Gaines, and Harman) FEBRUARY 21, 2012 An act to amend Sections 7149 and 7149.05 of the Fish and Game Code, relating to sport fishing. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1786, as amended, Mansoor. Sport fishing: licenses. Existing law requires every person 16 years of age or older who takes any fish, reptile, or amphibian for any purpose other than profit to first obtain a license for that purpose, with specified exceptions, and to have that license on his or her person or in his or her immediate possession when engaged in carrying out any activity authorized by the license. Existing law requires a resident or a nonresident, 16 years of age or older, upon payment of  a specified   the applicable  fee, to be issued a sport fishing license for the period of a calendar year, or, if issued after the beginning of the year, for the remainder  thereof   of the year . This bill would  instead, for sport fishing licenses not issued through the Automated License Data System and for sport fishing licenses issued through the Automated License Data System on and after July 1, 2014,   revise those provisions to  require  , on and after January 1, 2015, that  a resident or a nonresident, 16 years of age or older, upon payment of  a   the applicable  fee,  to  be issued a sport fishing license for the period of 12 consecutive months beginning on the date specified on the license. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 7149 of the Fish and Game Code is amended to read: 7149. (a) A sport fishing license granting the privilege to take any fish, reptile, or amphibian anywhere in this state for purposes other than profit shall be issued to any of the following:  (1) A resident, 16 years of age or older, for the period of 12 consecutive months beginning on the date specified on the license, upon payment of a base fee of thirty-one dollars and twenty-five cents ($31.25).   (2) A nonresident, 16 years of age or older, for the period of 12 consecutive months beginning on the date specified on the license, upon payment of a base fee of eighty-four dollars ($84).   (1) (A) Until January 1, 2015, a resident, 16 years of age or older, for a calendar year, or, if issued after the beginning of the year, for the remainder thereof, upon payment of a base fee of thirty-one dollars and twenty-five cents ($31.25).   (B) On and after January 1, 2015, a resident, 16 years of age or older, for the period of 12 consecutive months beginning on the date specified on the license, upon payment of a base fee of thirty-one dollars and twenty-five cents ($31.25).   (2) (A) Until January 1, 2015, a nonresident, 16 years of age or older, for a calendar year, or, if issued after the beginning of the year, for the remainder thereof, upon payment of a base fee of eighty-four dollars ($84).   (B) On and after January 1, 2015, a nonresident, 16 years of age or older, for the period of 12 consecutive months beginning on the date specified on the license, upon payment of a base fee of eighty-four dollars ($84).  (3) A nonresident, 16 years of age or older, for the period of 10 consecutive days beginning on the date specified on the license, upon payment of the fee set forth in paragraph (1). (4) A resident or nonresident, 16 years of age or older, for two consecutive designated calendar days, upon payment of  half   one-half  of the fee set forth in paragraph (1). Notwithstanding Section 1053, more than one two-day license issued for different two-day periods may be issued to, or possessed by, a person at one time. (5) A resident or nonresident, 16 years of age or older, for one designated day, upon payment of a base fee of ten dollars ($10). (b) California sport fishing license stamps shall be issued by authorized license agents in the same manner as sport fishing licenses, and  no  compensation  may   shall not be paid to the authorized license agent for issuing the stamps except as provided in Section 1055. (c) This section does not apply to licenses, permits, reservations, tags, or other entitlements issued through the Automated License Data System. (d) The base fees specified in this section are applicable to the 2004 license year, and shall be adjusted annually thereafter pursuant to Section 713. SEC. 2. Section 7149.05 of the Fish and Game Code is amended to read: 7149.05. (a) A sport fishing license granting the privilege to take any fish, reptile, or  amphibia   amphibian  anywhere in this state for purposes other than profit shall be issued to any of the following: (1) (A) Until  July 1, 2014,   January 1, 2015,  a resident, 16 years of age or older, for a calendar year, or, if issued after the beginning of the year, for the remainder thereof, upon payment of a base fee of thirty-one dollars and twenty-five cents ($31.25). (B) On and after  July 1, 2014,   January 1, 2015,  a resident, 16 years of age or older, for the period of 12 consecutive months beginning on the date specified on the license upon payment of a base fee of thirty-one dollars and twenty-five cents ($31.25).  (2) A nonresident, 16 years of age or older, for the period of a calendar year, or, if issued after the beginning of the year, for the remainder thereof, upon payment of a base fee of eighty-four dollars ($84).   (2) (A) Until January 1, 2015, a nonresident, 16 years of age or older, for a calendar year, or, if issued after the beginning of the year, for the remainder thereof, upon payment of a base fee of eighty-four dollars ($84).   (B) On and after January 1, 2015, a nonresident, 16 years of age or older, for the period of 12 consecutive months beginning on the date specified on the license, upon payment of a base fee of eighty-four dollars ($84).  (3) A nonresident, 16 years of age or older for the period of 10 consecutive days beginning on the date specified on the license upon payment of the fee set forth in paragraph (1). (4) A resident or nonresident, 16 years of age or older, for two designated days, upon payment of  half   one-half of  the fee set forth in paragraph (1). Notwithstanding Section 1053, more than one single day license issued for different days may be issued to, or possessed by, a person at one time. (5) A resident or nonresident, 16 years of age or older, for one designated day upon payment of a base fee of ten dollars ($10). (b) California sport fishing license validations shall be issued by authorized license agents in the same manner as sport fishing licenses, and  no  compensation shall  not  be paid to the authorized license agent for issuing the validations except as provided in Section 1055.1. (c) This section applies only to licenses, permits, reservations, tags, and other entitlements issued through the Automated License Data System. (d) The base fees specified in this section are applicable to the 2004 license year, and shall be adjusted annually thereafter pursuant to Section 713.