California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1877 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/10/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1877AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 10, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 29, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 19, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Members Ma and Olsen FEBRUARY 22, 2012 An act to amend Section 7500.3 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to repossessors. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1877, as amended, Ma. Repossession agencies: exemptions. Existing law, the Collateral Recovery Act, provides for the licensure and regulation of repossession agencies by the Bureau of Security and Investigative Services under the supervision and control of the Director of Consumer Affairs. The act provides that a repossession agency does not include the legal owner of collateral that is subject to a security agreement or a bona fide employee of the legal owner of collateral that is subject to a security agreement. This bill would add that a repossession agency does not include a dealer regularly engaged in the sale of specified collateral that is subject to a specified security agreement, and its bona fide employees. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 7500.3 of the Business and Professions Code is amended to read: 7500.3. A repossession agency shall not include any of the following: (a) Any bank subject to the jurisdiction of the Commissioner of Financial Institutions of the State of California under Division 1 (commencing with Section 99) of the Financial Code or the Comptroller of the Currency of the United States. (b) Any person organized, chartered, or holding a license or authorization certificate to make loans pursuant to the laws of this state or the United States who is subject to supervision by any official or agency of this state or the United States. (c) An attorney at law in performing his or her duties as an attorney at law. (d) The legal owner of collateral that is subject to a security agreement; a dealer, including its bona fide employees, regularly engaged in the sale of collateral designed primarily for agricultural use, as defined in subdivision (b) of Section 51201 of the Government Code, for use in the care of lawns and gardens, or for use as special construction equipment, as defined in subdivision (b) of Section 565 of the Vehicle Code,  or for use in the production, generation, storage, or transmission of mechanical or electric energy,  that is subject to a security agreement of the manufacturer or an affiliate of that manufacturer; or a bona fide employee employed exclusively and regularly by the legal owner of collateral that is subject to a security agreement. With regard to collateral subject to registration under the Vehicle Code, the legal owner shall be the legal owner listed on the records of the Department of Motor Vehicles or the seller or lessor named on a valid conditional sales contract or rental or lease agreement if the seller or lessor is a licensed vehicle dealer as defined in Section 285 of the Vehicle Code. (e) An officer or employee of the United States of America, or of this state or a political subdivision thereof, while the officer or employee is engaged in the performance of his or her official duties. (f) A qualified certificate holder or a registrant when performing services for, or on behalf of, a licensee.