California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB199 Amended / Bill

Filed 07/12/2011

 BILL NUMBER: AB 199AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 12, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 28, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 17, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Members Ma and Cook (Principal coauthor: Senator Yee)  (   Coauthor:   Assembly Member   Hill   )  JANUARY 27, 2011 An act to amend Section 51221.3 of the Education Code, relating to school curriculum. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 199, as amended, Ma. School curriculum: social sciences: Filipinos in World War II. Existing law requires the adopted course of study for grades 7 to 12, inclusive, to include instruction in social sciences, which is permitted to include instruction on World War II and the American role in that war. Existing law encourages that instruction to include a component drawn from personal testimony of American soldiers who were involved in World War II and those men and women who contributed to the war effort on the homefront. This bill would encourage instruction in social sciences for grades 7 to 12, inclusive, to include instruction on World War II and the role of Filipinos in that war, and would encourage that instruction to include a component drawn from personal testimony, as provided. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: no. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 51221.3 of the Education Code is amended to read: 51221.3. (a) Instruction in the area of social sciences, as required pursuant to subdivision (b) of Section 51220, may include instruction on World War II and the American role in that war. The Legislature encourages this instruction to include, but not be limited to, a component drawn from personal testimony, especially in the form of oral or video histories, if available, of American soldiers who were involved in World War II and those men and women who contributed to the war effort on the homefront. The oral histories used as part of the instruction regarding World War II shall exemplify the personal sacrifice and courage of the wide range of ordinary citizens who were called upon to participate. The oral histories shall contain the views and comments of their subjects regarding the reasons for American participation in  the war   World War II  and the actions taken to end the war in the Pacific. These oral histories shall also solicit comments from their subjects regarding the aftermath of  the war   World War II  in Eastern Europe and the former Soviet Union. (b) The Legislature finds and declares that the current state-adopted academic content standards already include instruction on the Korean War and the Vietnam War in the appropriate grade level consistent with those standards. The Legislature encourages that this instruction include a component drawn from personal testimony, especially in the form of oral or video histories, if available, of American soldiers who were involved in those wars. (c) (1) The Legislature encourages the instruction required pursuant to subdivision (b) of Section 51220 to include instruction on World War II and the role of Filipinos in that war, consisting of an accurate history of the contributions of the Filipino American veterans who fought courageously in the United States Army for freedom and democracy in World War II under the leadership of General Douglas MacArthur. (2) The Legislature encourages the instruction described in paragraph (1) to include a component drawn from personal testimony, especially in the form of oral or video histories of Filipinos who were involved in World War II and those men and women who contributed to the war effort on the homefront. The oral histories used as a part of the instruction regarding the role of Filipinos in World War II are encouraged to do all of the following: (A) Exemplify the personal sacrifice and courage of the wide range of ordinary citizens who were called upon to participate and to provide intelligence for the United States. (B) Contain the views and comments of their subjects regarding the reasons for their participation in  the war   World War II  . (C) Solicit comments from their subjects regarding the aftermath of  the war   World War II  and the immigration of Filipinos to the United States.