BILL NUMBER: AB 2034AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 15, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 25, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 29, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 14, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Fuentes (Principal coauthor: Assembly Member Bonilla) FEBRUARY 23, 2012 An act to add Section 125191.5 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to health services. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2034, as amended, Fuentes. Medical care: genetically handicapping conditions. Existing law, the Holden-Moscone-Garamendi Genetically HandicappedPerson'sPersons Program (GHPP), requires the Director of Health Care Services to establish and administer a program for the medical care of persons with specified genetically handicapping conditions and for persons with specified hereditary metabolic disorders. Existing law, the federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act (PPACA), among other provisions, reformed certain aspects of the private health insurance industry and public health insurance programs. This bill would require the State Department of Health Care Services, in consultation with designated entities,to develop a plan for the administration of the GHPP after the implementation of the PPACA. This bill would require the plan to address, among other things, preservation of the availability of wrap-around services that would otherwise not be available through the PPACA and the addition of genetic amyotrophic lateral sclerosis to the list of conditions covered under the GHPP or any subsequent care model developed after implementation of the PPACA . This bill would require the department to submit the plan to the relevant fiscal and policy committees of the Legislature by July 1, 2013. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 125191.5 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read: 125191.5. (a) The department, in consultation with the California Health Benefit Exchangeand the Advisory Committee on Genetically Handicapped Person's Program, shall develop a plan for the Genetically HandicappedPerson'sPersons Program after implementation of the federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act (Public Law 111-148). The plan shall address all of the following: (1) Wrap-around services that will not be available, in the absence of the Genetically HandicappedPerson'sPersons Program, after implementation of the federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act. (2) Continued coverage for any residual services and populations. (3) Adding genetic amyotrophic lateral sclerosis (ALS) to the Genetically HandicappedPerson'sPersons Program list of conditions, as described in Section 125130 or any subsequent care model developed after implementation of the federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act . Care and treatment provided for genetic ALS under the Genetically HandicappedPerson'sPersons Program, pursuant to the addition of genetic ALS to the Genetically HandicappedPerson'sPersons Program list of conditions, shall be consistent with the principles described in Section 104323. (b)As an alternative to consulting with the Advisory Committee on Genetically Handicapped Person's Program, inIn developing the plan described in subdivision (a), the department may consult with stakeholders, representatives of Genetically HandicappedPerson'sPersons Program providers, persons with genetically handicapped conditions, special care centers, genetic disease medical experts, and other interested persons. (c) The department shall submit the plan described in subdivision (a)shall be submittedto the relevant fiscal and policy committees of the Legislature by July 1, 2013.