California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2034 Amended / Bill

Filed 08/21/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2034AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 21, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 15, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 25, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 29, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 14, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Fuentes (Principal coauthor: Assembly Member Bonilla) FEBRUARY 23, 2012 An act to add  and repeal  Section 125191.5  to   of  the Health and Safety Code, relating to health services. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2034, as amended, Fuentes. Medical care: genetically handicapping conditions. Existing law, the Holden-Moscone-Garamendi Genetically Handicapped Persons Program (GHPP), requires the Director of Health Care Services to establish and administer a program for the medical care of persons with specified genetically handicapping conditions and for persons with specified hereditary metabolic disorders. Existing law, the federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act (PPACA), among other provisions, reformed certain aspects of the private health insurance industry and public health insurance programs. This bill would require the State Department of Health Care Services to  develop a plan for the administration of   prepare a report on the coverage needs of the population served by  the GHPP after the implementation of the PPACA. This bill would require the  plan   report  to address, among other things, preservation of the availability of wrap-around services that would otherwise not be available through the PPACA and the  addition of   extent to which a person with  genetic amyotrophic lateral sclerosis  to the list of conditions covered under the GHPP or any subsequent care model developed   will continue to have unmet medical needs  after implementation of the PPACA. This bill would require the department to submit the  plan   report  to the relevant fiscal and policy committees of the Legislature by  July 1, 2013   January 1, 2015  . Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 125191.5 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read: 125191.5. (a) The department  , in consultation with the California Health Benefit Exchange, shall develop a plan for   shall prepare a report on the coverage needs of the population served by  the Genetically Handicapped Persons Program after implementation of the federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act (Public Law 111-148). The  plan   report  shall address all of the following: (1) Wrap-around services that will not be available, in the absence of the Genetically Handicapped Persons Program, after implementation of the federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act. (2) Continued coverage for any residual services and populations. (3)  Adding   The extent to which a person with  genetic amyotrophic lateral sclerosis (ALS)  to the Genetically Handicapped Persons Program list of conditions, as described in Section 125130 or any subsequent care model developed   will continue to have unmet medical needs  after implementation of the federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act.  Care and treatment provided for genetic ALS under the Genetically Handicapped Persons Program, pursuant to the addition of genetic ALS to the Genetically Handicapped Persons Program list of conditions, shall be consistent with the principles described in Section 104323.  (b) In developing the  plan   report  described in subdivision (a), the department may consult with stakeholders, representatives of Genetically Handicapped Persons Program providers, persons with genetically handicapped conditions, special care centers, genetic disease medical experts, and other interested persons. (c) The department shall submit  , in accordance with Section 9795 of the Government Code,  the  plan   report  described in subdivision (a) to the relevant fiscal and policy committees of the Legislature by  July 1, 2013   January 1, 2015  .  (d) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2019, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2019, deletes or extends that date.