California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2068 Amended / Bill

Filed 06/26/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2068AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 26, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 21, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 9, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Portantino (Coauthors: Assembly Members Cook and Jeffries) (Coauthors: Senators Cannella, Dutton, and Rubio) FEBRUARY 23, 2012 An act to amend Section 5002.8 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2068, as amended, Portantino. Vehicles: license plates: legislative and congressional members. Existing law authorizes the Department of Motor Vehicles to issue distinctive license plates for a motor vehicle owned by a current or retired Member of the California Legislature and a Member of the Congress of the United States and requires that the person pay additional fees in addition to the regular fees for an original registration or renewal of registration.  Existing law establishes the California Environmental License Plate Fund in the State Treasury and requires, after certain moneys are deducted by the Controller, that the balance of the moneys in the fund be available for expenditure for specific trust purposes.  This bill would make the additional fees  for these distinctive license plates  the same as the fees paid by an applicant for a personalized license plate. The bill would also make the Member subject to a transfer fee  and   for these distinctive license plates. The bill  would require  that all additional   the department to deposit in the California Environmental License Plate Fund all  fees received by the department in payment for the issuance, renewal, or transfer of the special license plates authorized under these provisions  be deposited  in the  Motor Vehicle Account   ,   after the department deducts its costs in administering these provisions  . Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 5002.8 of the Vehicle Code is amended to read: 5002.8. (a) (1) Distinctive license plates issued for a motor vehicle owned by a current or retired Member of the California Legislature, which plates denote that the person is, or was, a Member of the Legislature, and distinctive license plates issued for a vehicle owned by a Member of the Congress of the United States, which plates denote that the person is a Member of Congress, shall be subject to the regular fees for an original registration or renewal of registration. (2) In addition to the regular fees for an original registration or renewal of registration, the applicant shall be charged the following additional fees: (b) For an original registration, the applicant shall be charged the fee specified in subdivision (a) of Section 5106. (c) For a renewal of registration, the applicant shall be charged the fee specified in subdivision (b) of Section 5106. (d) When a Member or former Member of the California Legislature or a Member of the Congress of the United States who has been issued personalized license plates pursuant to this section applies to the department for transfer of the plates to another passenger vehicle, commercial motor vehicle, trailer, or semitrailer, a transfer fee in the amount specified pursuant to Section 5108 shall be charged in addition to all other appropriate fees. (e)  All additional   After deducting the costs incurred by the department to administer this section, the department shall deposit in the California Environmental License Plate Fund, all  fees received by the department in payment for the issuance, renewal, or transfer of the special license plates authorized under this section  shall be deposited in the Motor Vehicle Account  .