California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2115 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/31/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2115AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 31, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 10, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 29, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Alejo FEBRUARY 23, 2012 An act to amend Section 32121.5 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to local  hospital   health care  districts. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2115, as amended, Alejo. Local  hospital   health care  districts: employment contracts. Existing law, the Local Health Care District Law, regulates local  hospital   health care  districts and authorizes the  hospital   health care  districts to exercise specified powers. Existing law authorizes a local  hospital   health care  district to enter into an employment contract with a hospital administrator. This bill would require a local  hospital   health care  district  that   , if it  employs  or contracts for  a hospital administrator  or chief executive   officer,  to enter into a written employment contract with the hospital administrator  or chief executive officer  , thereby imposing a state-mandated local program. The California Constitution requires the state to reimburse local agencies and school districts for certain costs mandated by the state. Statutory provisions establish procedures for making that reimbursement. This bill would provide that, if the Commission on State Mandates determines that the bill contains costs mandated by the state, reimbursement for those costs shall be made pursuant to these statutory provisions. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: yes. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Section 32121.5 of the   Health and Safety Code   is amended t   o read:  32121.5.  (a)    Notwithstanding any other provision of this division, a local  hospital   health care  district may enter into a contract of employment with a hospital administrator  or chief executive officer   , the duration of which shall not exceed four years, but which may periodically be renewed upon expiration for not more than four years  .  (b) If a local health care district employs or contracts for a hospital administrator or chief executive officer pursuant to subdivision (a), the district shall enter into a written employment agreement with the hospital administrator or chief executive officer, not to exceed four years, but which may periodically be renewed for not more than four years.   SECTION 1.   Section 32121.5 of the Health and Safety Code is amended to read: 32121.5. Notwithstanding any other provision of this division, a local hospital district shall, if employing a hospital administrator, enter into a written contract of employment with the hospital administrator. The duration of the employment contract shall not exceed four years, but may periodically be renewed upon expiration for not more than four years.  SEC. 2. If the Commission on State Mandates determines that this act contains costs mandated by the state, reimbursement to local agencies and school districts for those costs shall be made pursuant to Part 7 (commencing with Section 17500) of Division 4 of Title 2 of the Government Code.