BILL NUMBER: AB 2131CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 696 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 28, 2012 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 28, 2012 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 9, 2012 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 13, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 26, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Olsen (Coauthor: Assembly Member Gordon) FEBRUARY 23, 2012 An act to amend Sections 27000.8 and 27000.9 of the Government Code, relating to local government. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2131, Olsen. Local government: tax collectors: continuing education. Existing law requires a county treasurer, whether elected or appointed, to complete a valid continuing course of study, on or before June 30 of each 2-year period, and to provide certification of completion of that course to the Controller. The continuing education program is required to consist of, at a minimum, 24 hours or an equivalent amount of continuing education units within the discipline of treasury management, public finance, public administration, governmental accounting, or directly related subjects, as specified. This bill would additionally require the continuing education course to include tax collection in the continuing education disciplines described above. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 27000.8 of the Government Code is amended to read: 27000.8. Any duly elected county treasurer, county tax collector, or county treasurer-tax collector serving in that office on January 1, 1996, may serve for his or her remaining term of office during which period of time the requirements of this section shall not apply. After the election of a county treasurer, county tax collector, or county treasurer-tax collector to office, that person shall complete a valid continuing course of study as prescribed in this section, and shall during the person's four-year term of office on or before June 30 of the fourth year, render to the Controller a certification indicating that the person has successfully completed a continuing education program consisting of, at a minimum, 48 hours, or an equivalent amount of continuing education units within the discipline of treasury management, tax collection, public finance, public administration, governmental accounting, or directly related subjects, offered by a recognized state or national association, institute, or accredited college or university, or the California Debt and Investment Advisory Commission, that provides the requisite educational programs prescribed in this section. The willful or negligent failure of any elected county treasurer, county tax collector, or county treasurer-tax collector to comply with the requirements of this section shall be deemed a violation of this section. SEC. 2. Section 27000.9 of the Government Code is amended to read: 27000.9. Notwithstanding any other requirement of law, any duly appointed county officer serving in the capacity of county treasurer, county tax collector, or county treasurer-tax collector shall, beginning in 2000, complete a valid continuing course of study as prescribed in this section, and shall, on or before June 30 of each two-year period, render to the Controller, a certification indicating that the county officer has successfully completed a continuing education program consisting of, at a minimum, 24 hours or an equivalent amount of continuing education units within the discipline of treasury management, tax collection, public finance, public administration, governmental accounting, or directly related subjects, offered by a recognized state or national association, institute, or accredited college or university, or the California Debt and Investment Advisory Commission, that provides the requisite educational programs prescribed in this section. The willful or negligent failure of any county officer serving in the capacity of county treasurer, county tax collector, or county treasurer-tax collector to comply with the requirements of this section shall be deemed a violation of this section.