California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2170 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/02/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2170AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 2, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 29, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly  Member   Chesbro   Members   Chesbro   and Dickinson  FEBRUARY 23, 2012 An act to amend Section 4593.8 of, and to add Section 4594.8 to, the Public Resources Code, relating to forest resources. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2170, as amended, Chesbro. Forest resources: nonindustrial timber management plans. Existing law authorizes a person who intends to become a nonindustrial tree farmer to file with the Department of Forestry and Fire Protection a nonindustrial timber management plan, in accordance with specified requirements. Existing law authorizes the nonindustrial tree farmer to submit a proposed amendment to an approved nonindustrial timber management plan, but prohibits the nonindustrial tree farmer from taking any action that substantially deviates, as defined, from the approved plan until the amendment is filed with the Director of Forestry and Fire Protection and the director has determined that the amendment is in compliance with specified rules, regulations, and statutes in effect at the time the nonindustrial timber management plan was approved, in accordance with specified procedures. This bill would require the State Board of Forestry and Fire Protection to adopt regulations, no later than January 1, 2014, to provide for an appeal procedure in the event the department cancels a previously approved nonindustrial timber management plan. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   The Legislature finds and declares that there have been 693 nonindustrial timber management plans found to be in conformance with state law by the Department of Forestry and Fire Protection, covering a combined area of 283,000 acres.   SECTION 1.   SEC. 2.  Section 4593.8 of the Public Resources Code is amended to read: 4593.8. The nonindustrial tree farmer may submit a proposed amendment to the approved plan and may not take any action that substantially deviates, as defined by the board, from the approved plan until the amendment has been filed with the director and the director has determined that the amendment is in compliance with the rules and regulations of the board and the provisions of this chapter that were in effect at the time the nonindustrial timber management plan was approved, in accordance with the same procedures specified in Section 4593.7.  SEC. 2.   SEC. 3.  Section 4594.8 is added to the Public Resources Code, to read: 4594.8. The board shall adopt regulations, no later than January 1, 2014, to provide for an appeal procedure in the event that the department cancels a previously approved nonindustrial timber management plan.