California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2189 Amended / Bill

Filed 06/25/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2189AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 25, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 16, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 29, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Skinner FEBRUARY 23, 2012 An act to  add Section 1936.5 to the Civil Code, and to  amend Section 14608 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2189, as amended, Skinner. Vehicles: rentals: driver's licenses. Existing law prohibits a person from renting a motor vehicle to another unless the person to whom the vehicle is rented is a validly licensed driver, as specified, and the person renting to that driver has inspected the person's driver's license and compared the signature on the license with the signature of the driver written in his or her presence. This bill would  require a person renting a motor vehicle to another person , as an alternative to that inspection and comparison, to inspect the driver's license through electronic means   delete the requirement that the signature of the driver be written in his or her presence and would allow the person renting the vehicle to instead compare the photograph on the driver's license of the person with the person to whom the vehicle is to be rented  .  The bill would also exempt, a "rental company," as defined, from these requirements when entering into a rental transaction in which a vehicle that is part of a regional fleet is available to be rented electronically on either an hourly or daily basis.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: no. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Section 1936.5 is added to the   Civil Code   , to read:   1936.5. A "rental company" as defined in paragraph (1) of subdivision (a) of Section 1936 is not subject to the requirements of Section 14608 of the Vehicle Code when entering into a rental transaction in which a vehicle that is part of a regional fleet is available to be rented electronically on either an hourly or daily basis.   SECTION 1.   SEC. 2.  Section 14608 of the Vehicle Code is amended to read: 14608. (a) A person shall not rent a motor vehicle to another person unless both of the following requirements have been met: (1) The person to whom the vehicle is rented is licensed under this code or is a nonresident who is licensed under the laws of the state or country of his or her residence. (2) The person renting to another person has  done either of the following:   (A)     Inspected   inspected  the driver's license of the person to whom the vehicle is to be rented and compared  either  the signature  thereon with that of the person to whom the vehicle is to be rented or the photograph  thereon with  the signature of that person written in his or her presence   the person to whom the vehicle is to be rented  .  (B) Inspected the driver's license of the person to whom the vehicle is to be rented through electronic means.  (b) This section does not prohibit a blind or disabled person who is a nondriver from renting a motor vehicle if both of the following conditions exist at the time of rental: (1) The blind or disabled person either holds an identification card issued pursuant to this code or is not a resident of this state. (2) The blind or disabled person has a driver present who is either licensed to drive a vehicle pursuant to this code or is a nonresident licensed to drive a vehicle pursuant to the laws of the state or country of the driver's residence.