California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2214 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/25/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2214AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 25, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 27, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Monning FEBRUARY 24, 2012 An act to add  and repeal  Part 3.5 (commencing with Section 128590)  to  of  Division 107 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to health workforce development. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2214, as amended, Monning. Health workforce development. Existing law requires the Office of Statewide Health Planning and Development within the California Health and Human Services Agency to, among other things, (1) develop a Health Manpower Plan for California that consists of, among other things, appropriate standards for determining the adequacy of supply of specified health personnel, (2) maintain a Health Professions Career Opportunity Program that includes supporting and encouraging minority health professionals in training to practice in health professional shortage areas, and (3) establish a health care workforce clearinghouse to serve as the central source of health care workforce and educational data in the state. Existing law, the Song-Brown Health Care Workforce Training Act, creates the California Healthcare Workforce Policy Commission to, among other things, identify specific areas of the state where unmet priority needs for primary care family physicians and registered nurses exist. Existing law establishes the California Workforce Investment Board within the Labor and Workforce Development Agency to assist the Governor in the development, oversight, and continuous improvement of California's workforce investment system. This bill would require  , until January 1, 2019,  the California Workforce Investment Board to establish the Health Workforce Development Council to help expand California's health workforce in order to provide access to quality health care for all Californians. The bill would require the council to perform certain duties, including establishing a statewide plan for health workforce development, as specified. It would require the council to inform the Legislature of its health initiatives and progress, as specified. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Part 3.5 (commencing with Section 128590) is added to Division 107 of the Health and Safety Code, to read: PART 3.5. Health Workforce Development 128590. (a) The California Workforce Investment Board shall establish a special committee known as the Health Workforce Development Council to help expand the state's health workforce in order to provide access to quality health care for all Californians. In this regard, it is the intent of the Legislature to expand the state's full-time primary care workforce between 2013 and 2023. The membership of the council shall consist of the appropriate representatives from the board's existing membership, as well as representatives from other state agencies and departments, higher education, labor, the health care industry, workforce groups, philanthropic and nongovernmental entities, and other appropriate health advocates. (b) The council shall do all of the following: (1) Develop a comprehensive statewide plan and implementation strategy for health workforce development through strategic partnerships. (2) Examine proven strategies and policies to increase health workforce supply that can be replicated and deployed through sector strategy and other models. (3) Provide guidance on the development and maturation of regional health workforce partnerships to address regional health care and delivery system needs. (4) Use regional partnerships to identify and inform regional and statewide health workforce development priorities. (5) Seek expertise from multisector representatives to enhance the understanding of the issues and policies needed to ensure that California has the necessary workforce to provide access to quality,  and  culturally ,  and linguistically appropriate  ,  health care. (c) The board representative on the council shall be the chair of the council. (d) (1) The council shall inform the Legislature of its health initiatives and progress by providing the Legislature with a copy of the board's annual report to the federal Department of Labor. (2) The report submitted pursuant to paragraph (1) shall be submitted in compliance with Section 9795 of the Government Code. (e) For purposes of this part: (1) "Board" means the California Workforce Investment Board. (2) "Council" means the Health Workforce Development Council.  128591. This part shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2019, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2019, deletes or extends that date.