California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2262 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/23/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2262AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 23, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 10, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 20, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Bradford FEBRUARY 24, 2012 An act to amend  Section   S   ections  48981  and 48982  of the Education Code, relating to school districts. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2262, as amended, Bradford. School districts: governing boards: notification: parent rights and responsibilities. Existing law requires the governing board of a school district, at the beginning of the first semester or quarter of each school year, to notify parents or guardians of minor pupils of specified rights and responsibilities of the parent or guardian and of specified school district policies and procedures. Existing law provides that the notice may be sent by regular mail or by any other method normally used to communicate with parents or guardians in writing.  Existing law requires the notice to be signed by the parent or guardian and returned to the school. Existing law requires that, if 15% or more of the pupils enrolled in a public school speak a single primary language other than English, all notices, reports, statements, or records sent to the parent or guardian of such pupil be written in English and   that primary language, as specified.  This bill would authorize the governing board  of a school district  to provide this notification to a parent or guardian who requests to receive the notice in electronic format by providing access to the notice electronically  , and would require the notice provided in electronic format to conform to the primary language requirements described above. The bill would also require the parent or guardian, if the notice is provided in electronic format, to submit to the school a signed ac   knowledgment of receipt of the notice  . Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: no. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 48981 of the Education Code is amended to read: 48981. The notice shall be provided at the time of registration for the first semester or quarter of the regular school term. The notice may be provided using any of the following methods: (a) By regular mail. (b) If a parent or guardian requests to receive the notice in electronic format, by providing access to the notice electronically.  Notice provided in electronic format shall conform to the requirements of Section 48985.  (c) By any other method normally used to communicate with the parents or guardians in writing.  SEC. 2.   Section 48982 of the   Education Code   is amended to read:  48982.  (a)    The notice shall be signed by the parent or guardian and returned to the school. Signature of the notice is an acknowledgment by the parent or guardian that he  or she  has been informed of his  or her  rights but does not indicate that consent to participate in any particular program has either been given or withheld.  (b) If the notice is provided in electronic format pursuant to subdivision (b) of Section 48981, the parent or guardian shall submit to the school a signed acknowledgment of receipt of the notice.