BILL NUMBER: AB 2287INTRODUCED BILL TEXT INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Swanson FEBRUARY 24, 2012 An act to amend Section 1191 of the Harbors and Navigation Code, relating to bar pilotage. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2287, as introduced, Swanson. Bar pilotage: rates. Existing law provides for the licensing and regulation of pilots for Monterey Bay, and the Bays of San Francisco, San Pablo, and Suisun, and the payment of specified pilotage rates and charges imposed on vessels piloted in those bays. In that connection, existing law requires the Board of Pilot Commissioners for Monterey Bay, and the Bays of San Francisco, San Pablo, and Suisun Bays to recommend that the Legislature, by statute, adopt a schedule of pilotage rates providing fair and reasonable return to pilots engaged in ship movements or special operations if rates for those movements or operations are not specified by law. This bill would make technical, nonsubstantive changes in those provisions relating to the schedule of pilotage rates. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: no. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 1191 of the Harbors and Navigation Code is amended to read: 1191. (a) The board, pursuant to Chapter 6 (commencing with Section 1200), shall recommend that the Legislature, by statute, adopt a schedule of pilotage ratesprovidingthat provides fair and reasonable return to pilots engaged in ship movements or special operations if rates for those movements or operations are not specified in Section 1190. (b) A vessel using pilots for ship movements or special operations that do not constitute bar pilotage shall pay the rate that is specified in the schedule of pilotage rates adopted by the Legislature. (c) Consistent with the board's adoption of rate recommendations in May 2002, the minimum rates imposed pursuant to this section that are in effect on December 31, 2002, shall be increased by 26 percent on January 1, 2003; those in effect on December 31, 2003, shall be increased by 26 percent on January 1, 2004; those in effect on December 31, 2004, shall be increased by 14 percent on January 1, 2005; and those in effect on December 31, 2005, shall be increased by 14 percent on January 1, 2006.