California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB232 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 08/29/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 232ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 22, 2012 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 24, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 14, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JANUARY 4, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Members V. Manuel Prez and Alejo (Coauthor: Assembly Member Bradford) FEBRUARY 2, 2011 An act to amend Section 50832 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to economic development. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 232, V. Manuel Prez. Community Development Block Grant Program: funds. Existing law requires the Department of Housing and Community Development to allocate funds under the federal Community Development Block Grant Program to cities and counties. Existing law requires the department to determine, and announce in the applicable Notice of Funding Availability, the maximum amount of grant funds that may be used for economic development projects and programs, housing for persons and families of low or moderate income or for purposes directly related to the provision or improvement of housing opportunities for these persons and families, and for cities and counties that apply on behalf of certain Indian tribes. Existing law requires the department to develop and use certain eligibility criteria and requirements for certain economic development fund applications. This bill would make changes to the eligibility criteria and requirements developed and used by the department. The bill would also make conforming changes. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 50832 of the Health and Safety Code is amended to read: 50832. (a) In order to ensure that a city or county may apply for both economic development and general program grants pursuant to this chapter in the same year, each applicant shall have a maximum grant request limitation as determined by the department and announced in the applicable NOFA, excluding general allocation planning and technical assistance grants and economic development allocation planning and technical assistance grants made available under Section 50833, of which a maximum amount as determined by the department and announced in the applicable NOFA, per year may be used for either general program or economic development applications. These limitations may be waived for the economic development allocation based upon available economic development funds after September 1 of each year. The department shall aggressively inform eligible cities and counties of the eligibility criteria and requirements under this section and in Section 50833. (b) Except for applications specified in Section 50832.1, applications for all activities or set-asides under this section and Section 50833 shall be evaluated on a first-in, first-served basis. (c) For all economic development applications under this section or Section 50833, including economic development assistance grants, the department shall develop project standards and rating factors which meet the minimum requirements of federal statutes for eligible projects and that meet National Objectives. (d) A jurisdiction may submit multiyear proposals for a period not exceeding three years in duration.