California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2339 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/02/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2339AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 2, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 19, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Members Williams and V. Manuel Prez FEBRUARY 24, 2012  An act to add Section 740.5 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.   An act to add Section 25228 to the Public Resources Code, relating to energy.  LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2339, as amended, Williams. Energy: geothermal  heat pump.   technologies.   Under existing law, the Public Utilities Commission (PUC) has regulatory authority over public utilities, including electrical corporations and gas corporations, as defined. Existing law requires the PUC, in cooperation with specified entities, to evaluate and implement policies to promote the development of specified technologies.   The Warren-Alquist State Energy Resources Conservation and Development Act establishes the State Energy Resources Conservation and Development Commission (Energy Commission) and requires the Energy Commission to, among other things, serve as a central repository within the state government for the collection, storage, retrieval, and dissemination of data and information on all forms of energy supply, demand, conservation, public safety, research, and related subjects.  This bill would require the  PUC, in consultation with the State  Energy  Resources Conservation and Development  Commission,  by July 1, 2013, in consultation w   ith the Public Utilities Commission,  State Air Resources Board,  electrical corporations, and the geothermal heat pump and distributed solar thermal heating and cooling industries   and other stakeholders,  to evaluate policies  sufficient  to overcome barriers to the widespread deployment and use of geothermal  and solar heating and cooling   heat pump and geothermal ground loop  technologies.  The bill would require the PUC, by July 1, 2013, to adopt rules addressing specified issues regarding geothermal and solar heating and cooling technologies.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Section 25228 is added to the   Public Resources Code   , to read:   25228. On or before July 1, 2013, the commission, in consultation with the Public Utilities Commission, State Air Resources Board, and other stakeholders, shall evaluate policies to overcome barriers to the widespread deployment and use of geothermal heat pump and geothermal ground loop technologies. In evaluating these polices, the commission shall consider all of the following: (a) The benefits and costs to ratepayers specific to safer, more reliable, or less costly gas or electrical service and through greater energy efficiency, reduction of health and environmental impacts from air pollution, and reduction of greenhouse gas emissions related to electricity and natural gas production and use, through the use of geothermal heat pump and geothermal ground loop technologies. (b) The existing statutory and permit requirements that impact the widespread use of geothermal heat pumps and geothermal ground loop technologies and any other existing legal impediments to the widespread use of geothermal heat pump and geothermal ground loop technologies. (c) The impact of widespread use of the geothermal heat pump and geothermal ground loop technologies on achieving the state's goals pursuant to the California Global Warming Solutions Act of 2006 (Division 25.5 (commencing with Section 38500) of the Health and Safety Code) and achieving the state's energy efficiency goals.   SECTION 1.   Section 740.5 is added to the Public Utilities Code, to read: 740.5. (a) The commission, in consultation with the State Energy Resources Conservation and Development Commission, State Air Resources Board, electrical corporations, and the geothermal heat pump and distributed solar thermal heating and cooling industries, shall evaluate policies sufficient to overcome barriers to the widespread deployment and use of geothermal and solar heating and cooling technologies. (b) By July 1, 2013, the commission shall adopt rules addressing all of the following: (1) The technological advances that are needed to ensure the consideration of geothermal heat pumps and solar thermal heating and cooling in state policy and what role the state should take to support the development of these technologies. (2) The benefits and costs to ratepayers specific to safer, more reliable, or less costly gas or electrical service and through greater energy efficiency, reduction of health and environmental impacts from air pollution, and reduction of greenhouse gas emissions related to electricity and natural gas production and use, through the use of geothermal heat pump and solar thermal heating and cooling technologies. (3) The existing statutory and permit requirements that will impact the widespread use of geothermal heat pumps and solar thermal heating and cooling technologies and any recommended changes to existing legal impediments to the widespread use of geothermal heat pumps and solar thermal heating and cooling technologies. (4) The impact of widespread use of the geothermal heat pump and solar thermal heating and cooling technologies on achieving the state' s goals pursuant to the California Global Warming Solutions Act of 2006 (Division 25.5 (commencing with Section 38500) of the Health and Safety Code) and the renewables portfolio standard program pursuant to Section 399.12.