California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2358 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/22/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2358AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 22, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 16, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 29, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Members Hagman and Garrick (Coauthors: Assembly Members Achadjian, Bill Berryhill, Conway, Cook, Donnelly, Beth Gaines, Gorell, Grove, Halderman, Harkey, Jeffries, Jones, Knight, Logue, Mansoor, Miller, Morrell,  Nestande,  Nielsen, Norby, Olsen, Silva, Smyth, Valadao, and Wagner) (  Coauthor:   Senator   Strickland   Coauthors:   Senators   Anderson,   Berryhill,   Blakeslee,   Cannella,   Dutton,   Emmerson,   Fuller,   Gaines,   Harman,   Huff,   La Malfa,   Runner,   Strickland,   Walters,   and Wyland  ) FEBRUARY 24, 2012 An act to add Section 14632 to the Government Code, relating to the State Capitol. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2358, as amended, Hagman. State Capitol: Ronald Reagan Memorial. Existing law prescribes various duties for the Department of General Services in connection with development and maintenance of the park around the State Capitol Building. This bill would authorize the Ronald Reagan Centennial Capitol Foundation, in consultation with the department and a specifically created committee, to construct and maintain a memorial to Ronald Reagan in the State Capitol Building Annex. It would require that the planning, construction, and maintenance of the memorial be funded with private donations through the Ronald Reagan Centennial Capitol Foundation. It would prohibit construction of the memorial until the Department of Finance has determined that sufficient private funding is available to construct and maintain the memorial. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 14632 is added to the Government Code, to read: 14632. (a) The Ronald Reagan Centennial Capitol Foundation may, in consultation with the department, plan and construct a memorial to Ronald Reagan in the State Capitol Building Annex. (b) The Ronald Reagan Memorial Review Committee is hereby established and shall include as members all of the following: (1) The director, or his or her designee. (2) The State Historic Preservation Officer, or his or her designee. (3) A Member of the Assembly appointed by the Speaker of the Assembly. (4) A Member of the Senate appointed by the Senate Committee on Rules. (c) The committee shall consult with the Ronald Reagan Centennial Capitol Foundation to identify an appropriate location for the memorial in the State Capitol Building Annex and review a memorial design. (d) The department, in consultation with the Ronald Reagan Centennial Capitol Foundation, shall accomplish the following goals: (1) Review of the preliminary design plans to identify potential maintenance concerns. (2) Ensure Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990 (42 U.S.C. Sec. 12101 et seq.) compliance, and other safety concerns. (3) Review and approval of proper California Environmental Quality Act (Division 13 (commencing with Section 21000) of the Public Resources Code) documents prepared for work at the designated historic property. (4) Review of final construction documents to ensure that all requirements are met. (5) Prepare the right-of-entry permit outlining the final area of work, final construction documents, construction plans, the contractor hired to perform the work, insurance, bonding, provisions for damage to state property, and inspection requirements. (6) Prepare a maintenance agreement outlining the Ronald Reagan Centennial Capitol Foundation's responsibility for the long-term maintenance of the memorial due to aging, vandalism, or relocation. (7) Inspect the construction performed by the contractor selected by the Ronald Reagan Centennial Capitol Foundation. (e) If the Ronald Reagan Centennial Capitol Foundation undertakes responsibility to construct a memorial under this section, it shall, in consultation with the department, establish a schedule for the design, construction, and dedication of the memorial, implement procedures to solicit designs for the memorial, devise a selection process for the choice of the design, and establish a program for the dedication of the memorial. (f) The department and the Ronald Reagan Memorial Review Committee shall approve the design  and any other aspect  of the memorial. (g) If the Ronald Reagan Centennial Capitol Foundation undertakes responsibility to construct a memorial under this section, it shall not begin construction of the memorial until the Department of Finance has determined that sufficient private funding is available to construct and maintain the memorial. (h) The planning, construction, and maintenance of the memorial shall be funded exclusively through private donations to the Ronald Reagan Centennial Capitol Foundation. (i) If the Ronald Reagan Centennial Capitol Foundation undertakes responsibility to construct a memorial under this section, it shall sign a maintenance agreement with the state, as created under paragraph (6) of subdivision (d), to maintain the memorial with private contributions.