California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2358 Amended / Bill

Filed 08/23/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2358AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 23, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 14, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 22, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 16, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 29, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Members Hagman and Garrick (Coauthors: Assembly Members Achadjian, Bill Berryhill, Conway, Cook, Donnelly, Beth Gaines, Gorell, Grove, Halderman, Harkey, Jeffries, Jones, Knight, Logue, Mansoor, Miller, Morrell, Nestande, Nielsen, Norby, Olsen, Silva, Smyth, Valadao, and Wagner) (Coauthors: Senators Anderson, Berryhill, Blakeslee, Cannella, Dutton, Emmerson, Fuller, Gaines, Harman, Huff, La Malfa, Runner, Strickland, Walters, and Wyland) FEBRUARY 24, 2012 An act to add Section 14632 to the Government Code, relating to the State Capitol. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2358, as amended, Hagman. State Capitol: Ronald Reagan statue. Existing law prescribes various duties for the Department of General Services in connection with development and maintenance of the park around the State Capitol Building. This bill would authorize the Ronald Reagan Centennial Capitol Foundation, in consultation with the Department of  Finance   General Services  , to plan a statue of Ronald Reagan in the State Capitol Building Annex. The bill would require the Department of General Services and the Ronald Reagan Centennial Capitol Foundation to approve the design and any other aspect of the statue. The bill would require that the planning, construction, and maintenance of the statue be funded with private donations through the Ronald Reagan Centennial Capitol Foundation. The bill would prohibit construction of the statue until the Joint Committee on Rules has approved and adopted the plan for the statue, and the Joint Committee on Rules and the Department of Finance have determined that sufficient private funding is available to construct and maintain the statue. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 14632 is added to the Government Code, to read: 14632. (a) The Ronald Reagan Centennial Capitol Foundation may, in consultation with the Department of  Finance   General Services  , plan a statue of Ronald Reagan in the State Capitol Building Annex. (b) The Department of  Finance  General Services  , in consultation with the Ronald Reagan Centennial Capitol Foundation, shall accomplish the following goals: (1) Review of the preliminary design plans to identify potential maintenance concerns. (2) Ensure Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990 (42 U.S.C. Sec. 12101 et seq.) compliance, and other safety concerns. (3) Review and approval of proper California Environmental Quality Act (Division 13 (commencing with Section 21000) of the Public Resources Code) documents prepared for work at the designated historic property. (4) Review of final construction documents to ensure that all requirements are met. (5) Prepare the right-of-entry permit outlining the final area of work, final construction documents, construction plans, the contractor hired to perform the work, insurance, bonding, provisions for damage to state property, and inspection requirements. (6) Prepare a maintenance agreement outlining the Ronald Reagan Centennial Capitol Foundation's responsibility for the long-term maintenance of the statue due to aging, vandalism, or relocation. (7) Inspect the construction performed by the contractor selected by the Ronald Reagan Centennial Capitol Foundation. (c) If the Ronald Reagan Centennial Capitol Foundation undertakes responsibility to construct a statue under this section, it shall, in consultation with the  department   Department of General Services  , establish a schedule for the design, construction, and dedication of the statue, implement procedures to solicit designs for the statue, devise a selection process for the choice of the design, and establish a program for the dedication of the statue. (d) The  department   Department of General Services  and the Ronald Reagan Centennial Capitol Foundation shall approve the design and any other aspect of the statue. (e) If the Ronald Reagan Centennial Capitol Foundation undertakes responsibility to construct a statue under this section, it shall not begin construction of the statue until the Joint Committee on Rules has approved and adopted the plan for the  statute   statue  , and only if the Joint Committee on Rules and the Department of Finance have determined that sufficient private funding is available to construct and maintain the statue. (f) The planning, construction, and maintenance of the statue shall be funded exclusively through private donations to the Ronald Reagan Centennial Capitol Foundation. (g) If the Ronald Reagan Centennial Capitol Foundation undertakes responsibility to construct a statue under this section, it shall sign a maintenance agreement with the state, as created under paragraph (6) of subdivision (b), to maintain the statue with private contributions.