California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2382 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/15/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2382AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 15, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Gordon FEBRUARY 24, 2012 An act to add Section 14106 to the Government Code, relating to transportation. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2382, as amended, Gordon. Department of Transportation: Innovation District Demonstration Project. Existing law provides that the Department of Transportation has full possession and control of the state highway system. Existing law creates the Santa Clara Valley Transportation Authority with various transportation responsibilities in the County of Santa Clara. This bill would, by July 1, 2014, require the department, working in partnership with the Santa Clara Valley Transportation Authority, to establish the Innovation District Demonstration Project, designed to provide a new and innovative business model delivering transportation projects and services in the County of Santa Clara in a more responsive, cost-effective, and efficient manner and to serve as a mechanism for trying out new approaches for project delivery, local assistance, and transportation operations through streamlined processes, improved management techniques, and advanced technologies, with the goal of expediting project delivery and increasing the efficiency of the department. The bill would require the department and the authority to evaluate the effectiveness of the demonstration project and to report to the Legislature by January 1, 2018, on specified matters. By requiring the authority to participate in this demonstration project, the bill would impose a state-mandated local program.  The California Constitution requires the state to reimburse local agencies and school districts for certain costs mandated by the state. Statutory provisions establish procedures for making that reimbursement.   This bill would provide that, if the Commission on State Mandates determines that the bill contains costs mandated by the state, reimbursement for those costs shall be made pursuant to these statutory provisions.   The California Constitution requires the state to reimburse local agencies and school districts for certain costs mandated by the state. Statutory provisions establish procedures for making that reimbursement.   This bill would provide that no reimbursement is required by this act for a specified reason.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: yes. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 14106 is added to the Government Code, to read: 14106. (a) On or before July 1, 2014, the department, working in partnership with the Santa Clara Valley Transportation Authority, shall establish the Innovation District Demonstration Project. (b) The Innovation District Demonstration Project shall be designed to do both of the following: (1) Operate under a new and innovative business model for delivering transportation projects and services in the County of Santa Clara in a more responsive, cost-effective, and efficient manner. (2) Serve as a mechanism for trying out new approaches for project delivery, local assistance, and transportation operations through streamlined processes, improved management techniques, and advanced technologies, with the goal of expediting project delivery and increasing the efficiency of the department. (c) The department and the authority shall jointly conduct an evaluation of the demonstration project in order to determine its effectiveness. On or before January 1, 2018, the department shall submit a report containing the results of this evaluation to the Legislature, together with recommendations as to whether the project should be continued. The report shall be submitted in accordance with Section 9795 of the Government Code. The report shall also identify those elements of the demonstration project business model that are suitable for application by the department throughout its operations.  SEC. 2.   If the Commission on State Mandates determines that this act contains costs mandated by the state, reimbursement to local agencies and school districts for those costs shall be made pursuant to Part 7 (commencing with Section 17500) of Division 4 of Title 2 of the Government Code.   SEC. 2.   No reimbursement is required by this act pursuant to Section 6 of Article XIII B of the California Constitution because the only costs that may be incurred by a local agency or school district are the result of a program for which legislative authority was requested by that local agency or school district, within the meaning of Section 17556 of the Government Code and Section 6 of Article XIII B of the California Constitution.