California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2396 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 09/07/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2396CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 260 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 7, 2012 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 7, 2012 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 13, 2012 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY MAY 7, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Committee on Arts, Entertainment, Sports, Tourism and Internet Media (Campos (Chair), Olsen (Vice Chair), Achadjian, Butler, Carter, Gatto, Mendoza, and Monning) FEBRUARY 24, 2012 An act to amend Section 1308.10 of the Labor Code, relating to employment. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2396, Committee on Arts, Entertainment, Sports, Tourism and Internet Media. Employment of infants: entertainment industry. Existing law regulates the employment of minors in the entertainment industry and requires the written consent of the Labor Commissioner for a minor under the age of 16 to take part in certain types of employment. Existing law establishes a program to be administered by the Labor Commissioner that enables a minor's parent or guardian, prior to the first employment of a minor performer and under specified conditions, to obtain a temporary permit for the employment of a minor. Existing law prohibits the employment on a motion picture set or location of an infant under the age of one month unless a prescribed certification is made by a physician and surgeon who is board certified in pediatrics. This bill would provide that this requirement of medical certification of the infant must be met before a temporary permit for the employment of the infant may be issued. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 1308.10 of the Labor Code is amended to read: 1308.10. (a) Prior to the employment of a minor under the age of 16 years in any of the circumstances listed in subdivision (a) of Section 1308.5, the Labor Commissioner may issue a temporary permit authorizing employment of the minor to enable a parent or guardian of the minor to meet the requirement for a permit under subdivision (a) of Section 1308.5 and to establish a trust account for the minor or to produce the documentation required by the Labor Commissioner for the issuance of a permit under Section 1308.5, subject to all of the following conditions: (1) A temporary permit shall be valid for a period not to exceed 10 days from the date of issuance. (2) A temporary permit shall not be issued for the employment of a minor if the minor's parent or guardian has previously applied for or been issued a permit by the Labor Commissioner pursuant to Section 1308.5 or a temporary permit pursuant to this section for employment of the minor. (3) For infants who are subject to the requirements of Section 1308.8, a temporary permit shall not be issued before the requirements of that section are met. (4) The Division of Labor Standards Enforcement shall prepare and make available on its Internet Web site the application form for a temporary permit. An applicant for a temporary permit shall submit a completed application and application fee online to the division. Upon receipt of the completed application and fee, the division shall immediately issue a temporary permit. (b) The Labor Commissioner shall deposit all fees for temporary permits received into the Entertainment Work Permit Fund, which is hereby created in the State Treasury. The funds deposited in the Entertainment Work Permit Fund shall be available to the Labor Commissioner, upon appropriation by the Legislature, to pay for the costs of administration of the online temporary minor's entertainment work permit program and to repay any loan from the Labor Enforcement and Compliance Fund made pursuant to subdivision (c). (c) The Labor Commissioner may on a one-time basis borrow up to two hundred fifty thousand dollars ($250,000) from the Labor Enforcement and Compliance Fund, as established by subdivision (e) of Section 62.5, for deposit in the Entertainment Work Permit Fund to cover the one-time startup costs related to the temporary permit program. The loan shall be repaid to the Labor Enforcement and Compliance Fund as soon as sufficient funds exist in the Entertainment Work Permit Fund to repay the loan without compromising the operations of the temporary work permit program. (d) The Labor Commissioner shall set forth the fee in an amount sufficient to pay for these costs, but not to exceed fifty dollars ($50).