BILL NUMBER: AB 2399ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 23, 2012 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 28, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 21, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 9, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Allen FEBRUARY 24, 2012 An act to add Section 4141 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2399, Allen. Mental health: state hospitals: injury and illness prevention plan. Existing law provides for state hospitals for the care, treatment, and education of mentally disordered persons. These hospitals are under the jurisdiction of the State Department of State Hospitals, which is authorized by existing law to adopt regulations regarding the conduct and management of these facilities. This bill would require state hospitals to update their injury and illness prevention plans at least once every year, as specified, and would require the department to submit those plans to the Legislature every 2 years. This bill would require each state hospital to establish an injury and illness prevention committee, which would meet at least 4 times a year, to provide recommendations to the hospital's director on updates to the injury and illness prevention plan, and would also require each state hospital to develop an incident reporting procedure that can be used to, at a minimum, develop reports of patient assaults on employees and assist the hospital in identifying risks of patient assaults on employees. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 4141 is added to the Welfare and Institutions Code, to read: 4141. (a) (1) Each state hospital shall update its injury and illness prevention plan at least once a year to include necessary safeguards to prevent workplace safety hazards in connection with workplace violence associated with patient assaults on employees. (2) Updated injury and illness prevention plans shall address, but shall not be limited to, all of the following: (A) Control of physical access throughout the hospital and grounds. (B) Alarm systems. (C) Presence of security personnel. (D) Training. (E) Buddy systems. (F) Communication. (G) Emergency responses. (3) (A) The department shall submit the updated injury and illness prevention plans to the Legislature every two years. (B) (i) The requirement for submitting the updated injury and illness prevention plans imposed pursuant to subparagraph (A) is inoperative four years after the date the first report is due, pursuant to Section 10231.5 of the Government Code. (ii) Updated injury and illness prevention plans submitted pursuant to subparagraph (A) shall be submitted in compliance with Section 9795 of the Government Code. (b) Each state hospital shall establish an injury and illness prevention committee comprised of hospital management and employees designated by the hospital's director in consultation with the employee bargaining units. The committee shall be responsible for providing recommendations to the hospital director for updates to the injury and illness prevention plan. The committee shall meet at least four times per year. (c) Each state hospital shall develop an incident reporting procedure that can be used, at a minimum, to develop reports of patient assaults on employees and assist the hospital in identifying risks of patient assaults on employees. Data obtained from the incident reporting procedures shall be accessible to staff . The incident reporting procedure shall be designed to provide hospital management with immediate notification of reported incidents. The hospital shall provide for timely and efficient responses and investigations to incident reports made under the incident reporting procedure. Incident reports shall also be forwarded to the injury and illness prevention committee established pursuant to subdivision (b).