BILL NUMBER: AB 2409AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 26, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 2, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 18, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 29, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Allen FEBRUARY 24, 2012 An act to add Section2522825325 to the Public Resources Code, relating to energy efficiency. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2409, as amended, Allen. Energy efficiency. Existing law requires the State Energy Resources Conservation and Development Commission to implement various programs to provide financial assistance to specified entities for energy efficiency improvements. This bill would require the commission, in collaboration with specified entities, and in consultation with other stakeholders, including investor-owned utilities, to review emerging technology financing models used in other states to finance energy efficiency technology deployments and services that maximize private sector investment in California. The bill would also authorize the commission to establish and consult with an investment advisory group consisting of private and public investors. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section2522825325 is added to the Public Resources Code, to read:25228.25325. The commission, as a part of the integrated energy policy report prepared pursuant to Section 25302 and in collaboration with the Public Utilities Commission, the Treasurer's office, the State Air Resources Board, and the California Infrastructure and Economic Development Bank, and in consultation with other stakeholders, including investor-owned utilities, shall review and make recommendations based on emerging technology financing models used in other states to finance energy efficiency technology deployments and services with the goal of maximizing private sector investment in California. In addition to collaborating with these entities, the commission may establish and consult with an investment advisory group consisting of private and public investors for purposes of understanding what private investors have determined are the best models suited for helping California finance energy efficiency deployments. The commission shall avoid duplication of efforts taking place at the Public Utilities Commission related to energy efficiency financing, and shall, at a minimum, examine all of the following: (a) Long-term financing options, including, but not limited to, establishing, facilitating, or improving bonding authority to provide tax-exempt bonds, private activity bonds, or private investment bonds. (b) Potential financing models for implementing shared savings agreements between purchasers and sellers of energy efficiency technologies. (c) Potential financing models to finance energy efficiency improvements for state infrastructure and equipment. (d) Potential financing models to finance residential and business energy efficiency improvements.