California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2427 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/25/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2427AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 25, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 2, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Butler FEBRUARY 24, 2012 An act to add  and repeal  Section 89012 to the Education Code, relating to the California State University. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2427, as amended, Butler. California State University: special session fees. Existing law establishes the California State University, under the administration of the Trustees of the California State University, as one of the segments of public postsecondary education in this state. Existing law requires certain fees to be required of, and collected from, students enrolled in each special session, pursuant to rules and regulations prescribed by the Board of Trustees of the California State University. This bill would require the California State University, commencing on July 1, 2014, and each July 1 thereafter  until January 1, 2019  , to provide a report including specified information to the Legislature on the California State University Extended and Continuing Education Program. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 89012 is added to the Education Code, to read: 89012.  (a)    Commencing on July 1, 2014, and each July 1 thereafter, the California State University shall provide a report to the Legislature on the California State University Extended and Continuing Education Program, which shall include  , but not be limited to,  both of the following:  (a)   (1)  All of the following information for students who are enrolled in the Extended and Continuing Education Program on a systemwide and campus-by-campus basis:  (1)   (A)  The number of students  enrolled   registered  in the Extended and Continuing Education Program.  (2)   (B)  The number of full-time equivalent students enrolled in the Extended and Continuing Education Program.  (3)   (C)  The number of resident  undergraduate  students who are concurrently enrolled in state-funded courses at the California State University and the Extended and Continuing Education Program, and  both of the following:   (A)     The   the  number of extension units taken by  the   these  students  described in this paragraph  .  (B)   (D)  The number of extension courses and units taken by the students described in  this paragraph that were required for the student's degree   subparagraph (C) that count towards a California State University degree or graduation requirement .  (4)   (E)  The number of students  enrolled   registered  in the Extended and Continuing Education Program who are not concurrently enrolled in state-funded courses at the California State University.  (5) The number of working professional students who are seeking a degree and the number of working professional students who are not seeking a degree.   (6)   (F)  The number of  undergraduate  resident students enrolled in the Extended and Continuing Education Program who receive federal student loans and state and federal need-based financial aid.  (7) The demographic makeup of students enrolled in the Extended and Continuing Education Program, including, but not limited to, all of the following:   (A) Race or ethnicity.   (B) Gender.   (C) Income.   (D) Utilization of federal student loans or publicly funded financial aid programs.  (E) Receipt of resident tuition pursuant to Section 68130.5.   (b)   (2)  All of the following information on the courses offered through the Extended and Continuing Education Program on a systemwide and campus-by-campus basis:  (1)   (A)  The number of undergraduate  and graduate  courses offered through the Extended and Continuing Education Program.  (2)   (B)  The fees charged for each  undergraduate  course offered through the Extended and Continuing Education Program.  (3)   (C)  The number of California State University  undergraduate  courses that receive state funding for which a corresponding or equivalent  undergraduate  course is offered through the Extended and Continuing Education Program, including all of the following information for these courses:  (A)   (i)  The number of sections offered for each state-funded  undergraduate  course.  (B)   (ii)  The number of sections offered for each Extended and Continuing Education Program  undergraduate  course.  (C)   (iii)  The number of students enrolled in each state-funded  undergraduate  course and each Extended and Continuing Education Program  undergraduate  course.  (4)   (D)  To the extent possible, a five-year trend for the information provided pursuant to  subparagraphs (A) to (C)   clauses (i) to (iii)  , inclusive, of  paragraph (3)   subparagraph (C)  for each respective course.  (b) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2019, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2019, deletes or extends that date.